Kief et al v. Walmart, Inc.

Plaintiff: Jeffrey Kief and Nancy Kief
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02832
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: Maryland District Court
0 Judge: Richard D Bennett
1 Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2018 25 Joint Correspondence re: trial date (Kylis, Kelly)
November 1, 2018 24 Featured Case ORDER granting #23 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Join Additional Parties and to Defer Expert Testimony. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 11/1/2018. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
November 1, 2018 23 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Join Additional Parties and to Defer Expert Testimony by Walmart, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kylis, Kelly)
November 1, 2018 22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Join Additional Parties and to Defer Expert Discovery by Walmart, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kylis, Kelly)
October 26, 2018 21 Featured Case PAPERLESS ORDER denying #13 Because there is no settlement conference scheduled, the Motion is denied without prejudice. If the parties decide it would be helpful to have a settlement conference, please notify the court to request a referral to a magistrate judge for a settlement conference to be scheduled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 10/26/2018. (vals, Chambers)
October 26, 2018 20 Featured Case ORDER The deadlines set forth in Judge Bennetts Scheduling Order shall remain unchanged. (ECF Nos. 7, 11). Please submit a joint letter by November 5, 2018, indicating whether you would like to select a trial date at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 10/26/2018. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
October 16, 2018 19 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Alexander, Jennifer)
October 15, 2018 18 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Butler, William)
October 11, 2018 17 Featured Case ORDER Directing Parties to Submit Magistrate Judge Consent Form(s) re #16 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 10/11/2018. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
October 11, 2018 16 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher for all Proceedings. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 10/11/2018. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
October 10, 2018 Telephone Conference held on 10/10/2018 before Judge Richard D. Bennett. (Not on the record) (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
October 1, 2018 15 Status Report Submitted Concerning Consent to Proceed before United States Magistrate Judge by Walmart, Inc. (Kylis, Kelly)
September 24, 2018 14 QC NOTICE: #12 Notice (Other) filed by Walmart, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **Discovery material is not filed with the Court pursuant to Local Rule 104. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
September 24, 2018 13 Consent MOTION to Allow Defendant's Representative to Participate in Pre-Trial Settlement Conference by Phone by Walmart, Inc.(Kylis, Kelly)
September 24, 2018 12 (FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE by Walmart, Inc. of Service of Discovery (Kylis, Kelly) Modified on 9/24/2018 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
September 18, 2018 11 Featured Case MARGINAL ORDER granting #10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 9/18/2018. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
September 18, 2018 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Walmart, Inc..(Kylis, Kelly)
September 18, 2018 9 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Walmart, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate National Union Fire Ins. Co. of Pittsburgh, PA., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Other Affiliate WSE Management, LLC, Other Affiliate WSE Investment, LLC, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores East, LLC, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Property Co., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust for Walmart, Inc..(Alexander, Jennifer)
September 18, 2018 8 QC NOTICE: #5 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Walmart, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **The Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement needs to be refiled and the corporate parent and/or affiliations need to be entered when the system prompts you. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
September 17, 2018 7 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 1/30/2019. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 9/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Informal Discovery Letter)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
September 17, 2018 6 Correspondence re: Statement Regarding Standing Order Concerning Removal (Kylis, Kelly)
September 17, 2018 5 (FILED IN ERROR) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Walmart, Inc. (Kylis, Kelly) Modified on 9/18/2018 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
September 17, 2018 4 Jury Trial Demand by Walmart, Inc.(Kylis, Kelly)
September 17, 2018 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Walmart, Inc..(Kylis, Kelly)
September 12, 2018 2 Featured Case Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 9/12/2018. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
September 12, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore County, case number 03-C-18-007766-OT. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637108905), filed by Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Case Information Report, #4 Writ of Summons, #5 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(ko, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kief et al v. Walmart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer M Alexander
Represented By: Kelly Sullivan Kylis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Kief
Represented By: William N Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Kief
Represented By: William N Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?