MTF Apple Inc. v. Seasons Maryland LLC
Plaintiff: MTF Apple Inc.
Defendant: Mayer M. Gold, Zachary N. Richards and Seasons Maryland, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv02869
Filed: September 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER withdrawing #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction in light of #17 , Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 10/19. (lmys, Chambers)
October 18, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense as to Defendants Mayer Gold and Zachary N. Richards by MTF Apple Inc.(Surbey, Blake)
October 18, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE by MTF Apple Inc. re #16 Order Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Fassett, Mary)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER that Plaintiff shall advise the Court by October 24, 2018 whether it still seeks a preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 10/17/2018. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
October 17, 2018 Filing 15 Show Cause Hearing held on 10/17/2018 before Judge Paul W. Grimm. (FTR-SRS-4B.) (ss5s, Deputy Clerk)
October 4, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MTF Apple Inc.. Zachary N. Richards served on 9/19/2018, answer due 10/10/2018.(Surbey, Blake)
September 27, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MTF Apple Inc.. Mayer M. Gold served on 9/18/2018, answer due 10/9/2018.(Fassett, Mary)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER staying proceedings pending the resolutions of the bankruptcy case as to Defendant Seasons Maryland LLC t/a Seasons of Pikesville, a/t/a Seasons Baltimore (Only). Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/25/2018. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2018 Filing 11 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Seasons Maryland LLC t/a Seasons of Pikesville, a/t/a Seasons Baltimore by MTF Apple Inc.(Fassett, Mary)
September 18, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Issued 21 days as to Mayer M. Gold, Zachary N. Richards, Seasons Maryland, LLC.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
September 18, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Blake Alan Surbey on behalf of MTF Apple Inc. (Surbey, Blake)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 LETTER ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/17/2018. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why Prelimirany Injunction should not be entered. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/17/2018. (c/m 9/17/2018 heps, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 9/17/2018 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
September 17, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by MTF Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fassett, Mary)
September 17, 2018 Filing 5 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Without Notice by MTF Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memo in Support of Motions for Temporary Restraining Order without Notice and Preliminary Injunction, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Plaintiff First Choice, #3 Exhibit Ex 1_PACA License of First Choice, #4 Exhibit Ex 2_Defendant Corporate Information, #5 Exhibit Ex 3_Stmt of Account, #6 Exhibit Ex 4_Invoices, #7 Exhibit Ex 5_NSF Check, #8 Affidavit Attorney Certification, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Fassett, Mary)
September 17, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by MTF Apple Inc. re #1 Complaint, Summonses to be Issued (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons_Gold, #2 Summons Summons_Richards)(Fassett, Mary)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint, filed by MTF Apple Inc. was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Summons. To correct this problem, file Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Summons to #1 . (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
September 17, 2018 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by MTF Apple, Inc. t/a First Choice Food Distributors (Fassett, Mary)
September 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7562544.), filed by MTF Apple, Inc. t/a First Choice Food Distributors. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Statement of Account, #2 Exhibit 2, Sampling Unpaid Invoices, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fassett, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MTF Apple Inc. v. Seasons Maryland LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayer M. Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary N. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seasons Maryland, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MTF Apple Inc.
Represented By: Mary Jean Fassett
Represented By: Blake Alan Surbey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?