Cherry et al v. One Stop Auto Parts, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Albert Brown and Latarsha Cherry
Defendant: Ferdinand Greeff, One Stop Auto Parts, Inc. and Schrier, Tolin, & Wagman, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv03054
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: Maryland District Court
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2018 15 Local Rule 103.5 Certification(Rinehart, Elizabeth)
November 5, 2018 14 Supplemental to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Ferdinand Greeff, One Stop Auto Parts, Inc. Summons to Schrier, Tolin & Wagman, LLC (Attachments: #1 Defendant Schrier, Tolin & Wagman, LLC's Consent Motion for Extension of Time, #2 Order Granting Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time, #3 Entry of Appearance, #4 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(Rinehart, Elizabeth)
October 29, 2018 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Albert Brown, Latarsha Cherry.(Minton, Thomas)
October 22, 2018 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Ferdinand Greeff, One Stop Auto Parts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Letter to counsel)(Rinehart, Elizabeth)
October 18, 2018 11 Featured Case ORDER granting #10 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss and to Compel Arbitration. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 10/18/2018. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
October 17, 2018 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss to Compel Arbitration, #7 MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration by Albert Brown, Latarsha Cherry.(Minton, Thomas)
October 17, 2018 9 RESPONSE re #2 Standing Order Concerning Removal Joint Response filed by Ferdinand Greeff, One Stop Auto Parts, Inc., Schrier, Tolin, & Wagman, LLC.(Rinehart, Elizabeth)
October 11, 2018 8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Ferdinand Greeff, One Stop Auto Parts, Inc. (MacWilliams, Michael)
October 10, 2018 7 MOTION to Dismiss and, MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration by Ferdinand Greeff, One Stop Auto Parts, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(MacWilliams, Michael)
October 9, 2018 6 MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Albert Brown, Latarsha Cherry. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 Declaration of Alexa Bertinelli, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Minton, Thomas)
October 9, 2018 5 MOTION to Dismiss to Compel Arbitration by Schrier, Tolin, & Wagman, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Ross, David)
October 9, 2018 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Schrier, Tolin, & Wagman, LLC (Ross, David)
October 8, 2018 3 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Albert Brown, Latarsha Cherry (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Minton, Thomas)
October 5, 2018 2 Featured Case Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 10/5/2018. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
October 4, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore City, case number 24-C-18-004167. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7598569), filed by Ferdinand Greeff, One Stop Auto Parts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Complaint, #2 Attachment State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Attachment Summons -- One Stop Auto Parts, Inc., #4 Attachment Summons -- Greef, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rinehart, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cherry et al v. One Stop Auto Parts, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ferdinand Greeff
Represented By: Elizabeth Catherine Rinehart
Represented By: Michael B MacWilliams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Stop Auto Parts, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Catherine Rinehart
Represented By: Michael B MacWilliams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schrier, Tolin, & Wagman, LLC
Represented By: David Mitchell Ross, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Brown
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Minton
Represented By: Alexa Elena Bertinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latarsha Cherry
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Minton
Represented By: Alexa Elena Bertinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?