Burns v. Ashraf et al
Plaintiff: Da'Juan Burns
Defendant: Tammy Buser, Dayena Corcoran, Michael Turner, Mahboob Ashraf, Holly Pierce, Kris Swan, Ali Yahya, William Beeman, Asrehahegn Getachew, John Doe and Wexford Health Source, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv03100
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: James K Bredar
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Gina Marie Smith on behalf of Mahboob Ashraf, Tammy Buser (Smith, Gina)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Conrad Meister on behalf of Mahboob Ashraf, Tammy Buser (Meister, Douglas)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Gina Marie Smith on behalf of Asrehahegn Getachew, Ali Yahya (Smith, Gina)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Conrad Meister on behalf of Asrehahegn Getachew, Ali Yahya (Meister, Douglas)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Motion for Leave to Initiate Limited Discovery served on Ali Yahya, filed by Da'Juan Burns. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Initiate Limited Discovery by Da'Juan Burns (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Declaration, #3 Request)(bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Ari Jason Kodeck on behalf of Dayena Corcoran (Kodeck, Ari)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Gina Marie Smith on behalf of William Beeman, Holly Pierce, Kris Swan, Wexford Health Source, Inc. (Smith, Gina)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Conrad Meister on behalf of William Beeman, Holly Pierce, Kris Swan, Wexford Health Source, Inc. (Meister, Douglas)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Correspondence from Litigation Coordinator re: Accepting/Refusing Service. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Order to Show Cause, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Da'Juan Burns (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration)(bas, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to electronically send copy of Complaint and withhold service; DIRECTING counsel for defendants to notify court if service is accepted and to answer the Complaint ( re #1 Complaint filed by Da'Juan Burns ). Attachments will be emailed to attorneys who have not entered their appearance and were sent this NEF. Attorneys should contact the court if they do not receive the attachments; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 10/12/18. (c/m 10/15/18) (Attachments: #1 Institutional Coordinator Letter) (krs, Deputy Clerk)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Da'Juan Burns(bas, Deputy Clerk)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Da'Juan Burns(bas, Deputy Clerk)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mahboob Ashraf, William Beeman, Tammy Buser, Dayena Corcoran, John Doe, Asrehahegn Getachew, Holly Pierce, Kris Swan, Michael Turner, Wexford Health Source, Inc., Ali Yahya, filed by Da'Juan Burns.(bas, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burns v. Ashraf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Buser
Represented By: Douglas Conrad Meister
Represented By: Gina Marie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dayena Corcoran
Represented By: Ari Jason Kodeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mahboob Ashraf
Represented By: Douglas Conrad Meister
Represented By: Gina Marie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holly Pierce
Represented By: Douglas Conrad Meister
Represented By: Gina Marie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kris Swan
Represented By: Douglas Conrad Meister
Represented By: Gina Marie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ali Yahya
Represented By: Douglas Conrad Meister
Represented By: Gina Marie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Beeman
Represented By: Douglas Conrad Meister
Represented By: Gina Marie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asrehahegn Getachew
Represented By: Douglas Conrad Meister
Represented By: Gina Marie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Source, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Conrad Meister
Represented By: Gina Marie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Da'Juan Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?