Bellan v. Smith & Nephew, Inc.

Plaintiff: Lori Bellan
Defendant: Smith & Nephew Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv03163
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Maryland District Court
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 10, 2018 33 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
December 10, 2018 32 Featured Case ORDER Confirming results of the conference held on November 28, 2018. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 12/10/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
December 3, 2018 31 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated LIstings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
December 3, 2018 30 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/28/18, before Judge Blake. Court Reporter/Transcriber Douglas J. Zweizig, RDR, CRR, FCRR, Telephone number 410-962-4474 / douglas_zweizig@mdd.uscourts.gov. Total number of pages filed: 50. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/26/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/3/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/4/2019.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(dz, Court Reporter)
November 28, 2018 29 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Terry Botkin.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Davis, Alex)
November 26, 2018 28 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases(, #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
November 26, 2018 27 Correspondence re: Parties' Proposed Agenda for November 28, 2018 Status Conference Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Reiskin, Terri)
November 26, 2018 26 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No. 11. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 11/26/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
November 20, 2018 25 Correspondence re: Proposed Deposition Protocol (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Deposition Protocol - CMO 11)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Reiskin, Terri)
November 19, 2018 24 Featured Case ORDER in BHR Track Actions granting in part and denying in part (795) Motion to Dismiss Claims as Time-Barred in case 1:17-md-02775-CCB. The Plaintiffs are Granted Leave to Amend. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 11/19/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2018 23 MEMORANDUM in BHR Track Actions. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 11/19/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al(cags, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2018 22 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
November 15, 2018 21 Featured Case ORDER in all actions re: deposition protocols. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 11/15/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
November 14, 2018 20 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/13/18, before Judge Blake. Court Reporter/Transcriber Douglas J. Zweizig, Telephone number 410-962-4474 / douglas_zweizig@mdd.uscourts.gov. Total number of pages filed: 60. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/5/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/12/2019.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(dz, Court Reporter)
November 14, 2018 19 MDL Certified Transfer ORDER No. 48 transferring the attached case to the District of Maryland Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
November 12, 2018 18 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
November 5, 2018 17 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
November 2, 2018 16 Correspondence re: Plaintiff's Proposed Deposition Protocol (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Jenner, Robert)
November 2, 2018 15 Substantive legal issues - addressing (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Reiskin, Terri)
October 29, 2018 14 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
October 26, 2018 13 Featured Case ORDER in all Actions Directing Parties that no later than November 2, 2018 each shall file a letter brief outlining the areas of disagreement, and attaching their proposed version of a Deposition Protocol. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 10/25/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
October 22, 2018 12 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
October 15, 2018 11 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
October 12, 2018 10 Correspondence from Clerk to Counsel re MDL transfer(c/emailed 10/12/18 jnls, Deputy Clerk)
October 12, 2018 9 Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-05102. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 12, 2018 8 Certified JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-46): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the District of Maryland for the reasons stated in the order of April 5, 2017, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Catherine C. Blake. (Florio, Lisa)
October 12, 2018 7 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-46): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the District of Maryland for the reasons stated in the order of April 5, 2017, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Catherine C. Blake. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of Maryland. (Florio, Lisa)
September 18, 2018 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Nicole Sinnott on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Sinnott, Kristen)
September 12, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 1/14/2019 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein at the Central Islip Federal Courthouse, located at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York 11722. The parties shall appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. Plaintiff(s) shall serve a copy of this Notice of Hearing upon Defendant(s) and file proof of such service with the Court. c/ECF (Killigrew, Patricia)
September 12, 2018 5 Summons Issued as to Smith & Nephew, Inc. (Rodin, Deanna)
September 12, 2018 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
September 12, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
September 12, 2018 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
September 12, 2018 Incorrect Document Entry Information. Attorney used incorrect event when docketing the corrected civil cover sheet. Deleted document and re-docketed using the correct event. (Rodin, Deanna)
September 12, 2018 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Lori Bellan. (Rodin, Deanna)
September 11, 2018 A completed Civil Cover Sheet was not filed - specifically on page 2 the NY-E Division of Business Rule 50.1(d)(2)section of the document; all questions must be answered; the Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel is directed to submit the Civil Cover Sheet using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Rodin, Deanna)
September 10, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Smith & Nephew, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-10715517 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Lori Bellan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Dell, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bellan v. Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Nephew Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Bellan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?