Bowman v. Jack Cooper Transport Co. Inc.

Plaintiff: Keith Bowman
Defendant: Jack Cooper Transport Co. Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv03165
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Maryland District Court
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 26, 2018 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Jack Cooper Transport Co. Inc..(Niccolini, Robert)
November 26, 2018 11 RESPONSE in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Jack Cooper Transport Co. Inc..(Niccolini, Robert)
November 12, 2018 10 MOTION to Remand , MOTION to Remand to State Court by Keith Bowman (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ray, James)
November 12, 2018 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Keith Bowman.(Ray, James)
October 29, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER granting #7 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #5 MOTION to Dismiss . Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 10/29/2018. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
October 26, 2018 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Keith Bowman(Ray, James)
October 17, 2018 6 RESPONSE re #4 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Jack Cooper Transport Co. Inc..(Niccolini, Robert)
October 16, 2018 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Jack Cooper Transport Co. Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A-Select Portions of CBA, #3 Exhibit B-Arbitration Decision, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Niccolini, Robert)
October 15, 2018 4 Featured Case Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 10/15/2018. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
October 12, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Richard D. Bennett. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
October 12, 2018 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Jack Cooper Transport Co. Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Jack Cooper Holdings Corp. for Jack Cooper Transport Co. Inc..(Niccolini, Robert)
October 12, 2018 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Ross Niccolini on behalf of Jack Cooper Transport Co. Inc. (Niccolini, Robert)
October 12, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Howard County, case number C-13-CV-18-000473. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7611693), filed by Jack Cooper Transport Co. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-St. Ct. Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B-Scheduling Order and Case Information Report #4 Exhibit C- Decl. of Curtis Goodwin, #5 Exhibit D-Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Niccolini, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowman v. Jack Cooper Transport Co. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Cooper Transport Co. Inc.
Represented By: Robert Ross Niccolini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Bowman
Represented By: James Martin Ray, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?