Cavanaugh v. Medtronic, PLC et al

Plaintiff: Keith Sargeant Kavanaugh and Keith Sargeant Cavanaugh
Defendant: Covidien Holding, Inc., Owens & Minor Medical, Inc., Covidien LLC, Owens & Minor Distribution, Inc., Covidien Ireland Limited, Medtronic, PLC and Medtronic, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv03177
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Maryland District Court
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 30, 2018 19 NOTICE by Covidien Holding, Inc., Covidien LLC, Medtronic, Inc. re #18 Reply to Response to Motion, Amended Certificate of Service to Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss (Murphy, William)
November 30, 2018 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim COVIDIEN HOLDING INC'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Covidien Holding, Inc., Covidien LLC, Medtronic, Inc..(Murphy, William)
November 16, 2018 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Keith Sargeant Cavanaugh. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Valente, John)
November 13, 2018 16 Featured Case MARGINAL ORDER approving #13 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss filed by Medtronic, PLC, Covidien Ireland Limited. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 11/13/18. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
November 13, 2018 15 Featured Case MARGINAL ORDER approving #12 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Certain Defendants filed by Keith Sargeant Cavanaugh. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 11/13/18. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
November 13, 2018 14 Featured Case ORDER granting #11 Consent Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 11/13/18. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
November 12, 2018 13 NOTICE by Covidien Ireland Limited, Medtronic, PLC re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal Jurisdiction) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO DISMISS (Murphy, William)
November 9, 2018 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Keith Sargeant Cavanaugh (Valente, John)
November 9, 2018 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Keith Sargeant Cavanaugh. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Valente, John)
October 23, 2018 10 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Covidien Holding, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Medtronic, PLC for Covidien Holding, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Shelton, Alicia)
October 22, 2018 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Bryan T Pratt. Directing attorney Bryan T Pratt to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 10/22/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
October 22, 2018 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kayla Brewe. Directing attorney Kayla Brewe to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 10/22/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
October 19, 2018 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal Jurisdiction) by Covidien Ireland Limited, Medtronic, PLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Murphy, William)
October 19, 2018 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Covidien Holding, Inc., Covidien LLC, Medtronic, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Murphy, William)
October 17, 2018 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for BRYAN T. PRATT (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7620293.) by Covidien Holding, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Murphy, William)
October 17, 2018 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for KAYLA A. BREWE (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7620253.) by Covidien Holding, Inc.(Murphy, William)
October 17, 2018 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Alicia Leigh Shelton on behalf of Covidien Holding, Inc. (Shelton, Alicia)
October 16, 2018 2 Deficiency Notice -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 10/23/2018 (krs, Deputy Clerk)
October 12, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Catherine C. Blake. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
October 12, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Covidien Holding, Inc., et al. from Circuit Court for Howard County, case number C-13-CV-18-000427. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7612953), filed by Covidien LLC, Covidien Holding, Inc., Medtronic, PLC, Medtronic, Inc., Covidien Ireland Limited. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Circuit Court Complaint, #3 Attachment Circuit Court Case Information Report, #4 Attachment Writ of Summons Combined, #5 Attachment Affidavits of Service Combined, #6 Attachment Circuit Court Scheduling Order)(Murphy, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cavanaugh v. Medtronic, PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covidien Holding, Inc.
Represented By: William J Murphy
Represented By: Bryan T Pratt
Represented By: Alicia Leigh Shelton
Represented By: Kayla Brewe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owens & Minor Medical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covidien LLC
Represented By: William J Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owens & Minor Distribution, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covidien Ireland Limited
Represented By: William J Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic, PLC
Represented By: William J Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic, Inc.
Represented By: William J Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Sargeant Kavanaugh
Represented By: John P Valente, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Sargeant Cavanaugh
Represented By: John P Valente, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?