Ajala v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Adedeji Ajala
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2018cv03440
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: Maryland District Court
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 18, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER Granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 12/17/2018. (c/m 12/18/18 bas, Deputy Clerk)
December 17, 2018 3 MOTION for Extension of Time by Adedeji Ajala(bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 26, 2018 2 Featured Case ORDER Granting plaintiff 28 days to file a Complaint articulating the basis for his suit and file a Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis or to pay the full filing fee. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 11/26/2018. (c/m 11/26/18 bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 7, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America, filed by Adedeji Ajala.(bas, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ajala v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adedeji Ajala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?