Brown v. Commissioner, Social Security

Plaintiff: Rodney Brown
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security
Interested Party: SSA Notify
Case Number: 1:2018cv03443
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
0 Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
1 Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rodney Brown as to the Commissioner. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rodney Brown. Commissioner, Social Security served on 12/18/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Paperless order referring case to Magistrate Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher for pretrial management and report and recommendations pursuant to Standing Order 2014-01. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 11/14/2018. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued 60 days as to Commissioner, Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(jnls, Deputy Clerk)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion of plaintiff for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 11/13/2018. (c/m 11/13/18 jnls, Deputy Clerk)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Appearance and Consent to Magistrate Judge by Vickie LeDuc on behalf of Commissioner, Social Security (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rodney Brown (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner, Social Security, filed by Rodney Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (jnls, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Commissioner, Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Notify
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security
Represented By: Vickie LeDuc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?