Dorsey v. Brennan

Plaintiff: Stephan Dorsey
Defendant: United States Postal Service Post Master General and Megan J. Brennan
Case Number: 1:2018cv03473
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: Maryland District Court
Presiding Judge: Beth P Gesner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:623
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order 7 PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING Show Cause Hearing re: #5 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 11/28/2018. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order 5 ORDER directing Stephan Dorsey to show cause for failure to comply with #Standing Order 2018-04. Show Cause Hearing set for 12/28/2018 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before the Chambers Judge. This Order shall be vacated if Stephan Dorsey files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 11/28/2018. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 11/13/2018. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
November 13, 2018 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner. Stephan Dorsey or counsel for Stephan Dorsey are directed to the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 11/27/2018. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
November 13, 2018 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Summons filed by Stephan Dorsey. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Summons to be served on the Attorney General and U.S. Attorney. To correct this problem, file Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Summons to #1 Complaint. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
November 9, 2018 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against United States Postal Service Post Master General ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7665057.), filed by Stephan Dorsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Final Agency Decision, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Lyford-Pike, Roy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dorsey v. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephan Dorsey
Represented By: Roy Lyford-Pike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service Post Master General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan J. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?