Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2018cv03479
Filed: November 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:504
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #3 Motion to Expedite Discovery. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 1/3/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2018 Filing 5 Correspondence mailed to Register of Copyrights (c/m 11/15/2018 heps, Deputy Clerk)
November 10, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by Malibu Media, LLC re #3 MOTION to Expedite Discovery of Inability to Confer (Hoppe, Jon)
November 10, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Malibu Media, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoppe, Jon)
November 10, 2018 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Malibu Media, LLC (Hoppe, Jon)
November 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages for Property Rights Infringement against John Doe ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7666011.), filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Hoppe, Jon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Jon Alexander Hoppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?