Clark et al v. Council of Unit Owners of the 100 Harborview Drive Condominium
Appellant: Paul C. Clark, Sr., Paul Clark, Jr. and Rebecca Delorme
Appellee: Council of Unit Owners of the 100 Harborview Drive Condominium
Case Number: 1:2018cv03542
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by James R Schraf on behalf of Council of Unit Owners of the 100 Harborview Drive Condominium (Schraf, James)
December 19, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Yonka Stevens on behalf of Council of Unit Owners of the 100 Harborview Drive Condominium (Stevens, Lisa)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER regarding Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 12/18/2018. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
December 17, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION Briefing Schedule by Consent of the Parties by Paul C. Clark, Sr, Paul Clark, Jr, Rebecca Delorme (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McCarthy, Brennan)
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 Supplemental Transmittal of Record on Appeal by Bankruptcy Court for the District of Maryland. (Attachments: #1 ECF 27 Debtor's Exhibits Part 1, #2 ECF 27 Debtor's Exhibits Part 2, #3 ECF 27 Debtor's Exhibits Part 3, #4 ECF 27 Debtor's Exhibits Part 4, #5 ECF 27 Debtor's Exhibits Part 5, #6 ECF 27 Debtor's Exhibits Part 6, #7 ECF 27 Debtor's Exhibits Part 7, #8 ECF 27 Debtor's Exhibits Part 8, #9 ECF 27 Debtor's Exhibits Part 9, #10 ECF 27 Debtor's Exhibits Part 10, #11 ECF 27 Debtor's Exhibits Part 11, #12 ECF 28 Creditor's Exhibits, #13 ECF 38 Reorganized Debtor's Exhibits, #14 Supplemental Transmittal)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
November 28, 2018 Filing 6 TRANSMITTAL of Record on Appeal by Bankruptcy Court for the District of Maryland. (Part 5) ECF 680 Debors Trial Brief (Attachments: #1 ECF 681 Motion In Limine, #2 ECF 681-1 Exhibit 1, #3 ECF 681-2 Proposed Order, #4 ECF 689 Creditors Second Motion In Limine, #5 ECF 689-1 Expert Witness Designations, #6 ECF 689-2 Proposed Order, #7 ECF 690 Bench Brief in Support of Potential Objections to the Introduction of Certain Evidence, #8 ECF 692 Creditors' Response to Bench Brief, #9 ECF 692-1 Attachment, #10 ECF 692-2 Attachment, #11 ECF 694 Order Granting In Part and Denying in Part Creditors' First Motion In Limine, #12 ECF 695 Order Granting In Part and Denying In Part Debtor's Motion In Limine, #13 ECF 696 Order Denying Creditors' Second Motion In Limine, #14 ECF 699 Transcript of Proceeding Held on 2/6/18, #15 ECF 699-1 Notice of Requirement to Review Transcript, #16 ECF 713 Transcript of Proceedings held on 2/7/18, #17 ECF 713-1 Notice of Requirement to Review Transcript, #18 ECF 721 Transcript of Proceedings Held on 2/9/18, #19 ECF 721-1 Notice of Requirement to Review Transcript, #20 ECF 725 Transcript of Proceedings Held on 2/8/18, #21 ECF 725-1 Notice of Requirement to Review Transcript, #22 ECF 764 Creditors Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting Debtors Second Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #23 ECF 764-1 Proposed Order, #24 ECF 780 Transcript of Proceedings Held on 2/26/18, #25 ECF 780-1 Notice of Requirement to Review Transcript, #26 ECF 784 Correspondence, #27 ECF 797 Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration, #28 ECF 810 Creditors Objection to Debtors Third Amended Plan, #29 ECF 827 Debtors Memorandum in Support of Approval of Disclosure Statement and Confirmation of Fourth Amended Plan of Reorganization, #30 ECF 837 Creditors Reply to Debtors Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration, #31 ECF 841 Debtors Fifth Amended Plan of Reorganization, #32 ECF 841-1 Exhibit A, #33 ECF 846 Consent Order Authorizing the Debtors Use of Cash Callateral, #34 ECF 861 Order Confirming Debors Fifth Amended Plan of Reorganization, #35 ECF 862 Preliminary Order Regarding Creditors Damages Claim, #36 ECF 863 Order Denying Motion for Reconsideration, #37 ECF 905 Notice of Occurrence of Effective Date of Debtor's Confirmed Fifth Amended Plan of Reorganization, #38 ECF 956 Witness List, #39 ECF 957 Exhibit List, #40 ECF 961 Memorandum in Support of Final Order Regarding Creditors' Damages Claim, #41 ECF 962 Reorganized Debtors Objections to Creditors Apendix of Exhibits and Witnesses, #42 ECF 966 Transcript of Hearing on 8/27/18, #43 ECF 966-1 Notice of Requirement to Review Transcript, #44 ECF 967 Transcript of Hearing on 8/24/18, #45 ECF 967-1 Notice of Requirement to Review Transcript, #46 ECF 970 Stipulation and Consent Order on Application for Fees, #47 ECF 973 Transcript of Proceeding Held on 9/17/18, #48 ECF 973-1 Notice of Requirement to Review Transcript, #49 ECF 975 Final Order Regarding Creditors Damages Claim, #50 ECF 981 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election, #51 ECF 981-1 Final Order Regarding Creditors Damages Claim, #52 ECF 985 Notice of Cross Appeal, #53 ECF 987 Correspondence, #54 ECF 988 Designation of Items to be Included in the Record on Appeal, #55 ECF 989 Statement of Issues to be Presented, #56 ECF 996 Statement of Issues to be Presented on Cross Appeal, #57 ECF 997 Designation of Additional Items to be Included in the Record on Appeal, #58 ECF 998 Transmittal Sheet, #59 ECF 999 Amended Transmittal)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
November 28, 2018 Filing 5 TRANSMITTAL of Record on Appeal by Bankruptcy Court for the District of Maryland. (Part 4) ECF 603 Order Addressing Motion to Compel Emails (Attachments: #1 ECF 612 Opposition of Creditors to Debtors Third Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - Part 1, #2 ECF 612 Opposition of Creditors to Debtors Third Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - Part 2, #3 ECF 612 Opposition of Creditors to Debtors Third Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - Part 3, #4 ECF 612 Opposition of Creditors to Debtors Third Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - Part 4, #5 ECF 612 Opposition of Creditors to Debtors Third Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - Part 5, #6 ECF 612 Opposition of Creditors to Debtors Third Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - Part 6, #7 ECF 612 Opposition of Creditors to Debtors Third Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - Part 7, #8 ECF 612 Opposition of Creditors to Debtors Third Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - Part 8, #9 ECF 612 Opposition of Creditors to Debtors Third Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - Part 9, #10 ECF 612 Opposition of Creditors to Debtors Third Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - Part 10, #11 ECF 614 Creditors' Emergency Motion for Protective Order, #12 ECF 614-1 Attachment, #13 ECF 614-2 Attachment, #14 ECF 614-3 Notice of Service of Subpoena, #15 ECF 614-4 Affidavit of Attorney Fees, #16 ECF 614-5 Proposed Order, #17 ECF 615 Order Resolving Creditors' Emergency Motion for Protective Order, #18 ECF 616 Creditors' Emergency Motion for Clarification of Doc 591, #19 ECF 616-1 Order Clarifying Doc 591, #20 ECF 617 Order Clarifying Motion to Compel Deposition, #21 ECF 618 Scheduling Order, #22 ECF 619 Line Filing Amended Privilege Log, #23 ECF 619 Exhibit A, #24 ECF 620 Opposition to Creditors Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #25 ECF 620-1 Debtor's Response to Undisputed Material Facts, #26 ECF 620-2 Memorandum in Support of Debtor's Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #27 ECF 620-3 Exhibits List, #28 ECF 628 Order Resolving Motion to Compel Emails, #29 ECF 631 Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on FHA Claims, #30 ECF 632 Creditors Reply to Debtor's Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #31 ECF 632-1 Attachment, #32 ECF 632-2 Attachment, #33 ECF 637 Motion to Strike Debtor's Reply, #34 ECF 637-1 Debtor's Response to First Set of Continuing Interrogatories, #35 ECF 637-2 Attachment, #36 ECF 637-3 Attachment, #37 ECF 637-4 Proposed Order, #38 ECF 643 - Transcript of Proceedings Held on 1/5/18, #39 ECF 643-1 Notice of Requirement to Review Transcript, #40 ECF 647 Order Granting Debtor's Second Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #41 ECF 648 Memorandum Opinion, #42 ECF 649 Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Debtor's Third Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Creditors' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #43 ECF 650 Memorandum Opinion, #44 ECF 651 Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Creditors' Motion to Strike, #45 ECF 661 Consent Order Authorizing the Debtor's Use of Cash Collateral Through February 28, 2018, #46 ECF 665 Witness List of Council of Unit Owners of the 100 Harborview Drive Condominium, #47 ECF 666 Exhibit List for Claim Objection Trial, #48 ECF 667 Pre-Trial Memorandum, #49 ECF 678 Creditors' First Motion in Limine, #50 ECF 678-1 Proposed Order, #51 ECF 679 Debtor's Objections to Creditors' Amended Appendix on Exhibits for Trial and Witness for Trial)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
November 28, 2018 Filing 4 TRANSMITTAL of Record on Appeal by Bankruptcy Court for the District of Maryland. (Part 3) ECF 568 Third Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 ECF 568-1 Affidavit of Reuben Mezrich, #2 ECF 568-2 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #3 ECF 568-3 Memorandum in Support, #4 ECF 568-4 Exhibit 1, #5 ECF 568-5 Proposed Order, #6 ECF 578 Supplemental Briefing Memorandum, #7 ECF 579 Biefing Pursuant to Order Continuing Motion to Amend, #8 ECF 579-1 Exhibit A, #9 ECF 580 Supplemental Brief, #10 ECF 580-1 Attachment, #11 ECF 580-2 Attachment, #12 ECF 580-3 Attachment, #13 ECF 580-4 Attachment, #14 ECF 580-5 Attachment, #15 ECF 580-6 Attachment, #16 ECF 580-7 Attachment, #17 ECF 580-8 Attachment - Part 1, #18 ECF 580-8 Attachment - Part 2, #19 ECF 580-9 Attachment, #20 ECF 580-10 Attachment, #21 ECF 584 Opposition to Creditors' Motion for Court to Exercise its Discretion and Summarily Deny Debtor's Second and Third Motions for Summary Judgment, #22 ECF 585 Opposition to Motion to Compel Emails, #23 ECF 585-1 Exhibit A, #24 ECF 585-2 Exhibit B, #25 ECF 585-3 Exhibit C, #26 ECF 585-4 Exhibit D, #27 ECF 588 Order Scheduling Certain Matters for Hearing, #28 ECF 591 Order Resolving Motion to Compel Deposition, #29 ECF 593 Line Filing Affidavit of Joseph Melvin, #30 ECF 593-1 Affidavit of Joseph Melvin - Part 1, #31 ECF 593-1 Affidavit of Joseph Melvin - Part 2, #32 ECF 595 Creditors Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #33 ECF Proposed Order, #34 ECF 596 Creditors Memorandum in Support of their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - Part 1, #35 ECF 596 Creditors Memorandum in Support of their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - Part 2, #36 ECF 596 Creditors Memorandum in Support of their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - Part 3, #37 ECF 596 Creditors Memorandum in Support of their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - Part 4, #38 ECF 596 Creditors Memorandum in Support of their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - Part 5, #39 ECF 596 Creditors Memorandum in Support of their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - Part 6, #40 ECF 596 Creditors Memorandum in Support of their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - Part 7, #41 ECF 596 Creditors Memorandum in Support of their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - Part 8, #42 ECF 596 Creditors Memorandum in Support of their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - Part 9, #43 ECF 597 Line, #44 ECF 597-1 Affidavit of Freddy Vazquez, #45 ECF 597-2 Affidavit of Otto C. Guedelhoefer)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 TRANSMITTAL of Record on Appeal by Bankruptcy Court for the District of Maryland. (Part 2) ECF 553 Creditors Motion to Compel Emails and/or for In Camera Review of Emails (Attachments: #1 ECF 553-1 Attachment, #2 ECF 553-2 Attachment, #3 ECF 553-3 Attachment, #4 ECF 553-4 Proposed Order, #5 ECF 557 Opposition to Motion to Compel, #6 ECF 557-1 Exhibit 1, #7 ECF 557-2 Exhibit 2, #8 ECF 558 John H. Cochran's Opposition to Motion to Compel Deposition and/or for Sanctions, #9 ECF 566 Transcript of Hearing held on 11/16/17, #10 ECF 566-1 Notice of Requirement to Review Transcript, #11 ECF 567 Opposition of Creditors to Debtor's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #12 ECF 567-1 Appendix of Exhibits, #13 ECF 567-2 Affidavit, #14 ECF 567-3 Attachment, #15 ECF 567-4 Attachment, #16 ECF 567-5 Attachment, #17 ECF 567-6 Attachment, #18 ECF 567-7 Attachment, #19 ECF 567-8 Attachment, #20 ECF 567-9 Attachment, #21 ECF 567-10 Attachment, #22 ECF 567-11 Attachment, #23 ECF 567-12 Attachment, #24 ECF 567-13 Attachment, #25 ECF 567-14 Attachment, #26 ECF 567-15 Attachment, #27 ECF 567-16 Attachment, #28 ECF 567-17 Attachment, #29 ECF 567-18 Attachment, #30 ECF 567-19 Attachment, #31 ECF 567-20 Attachment, #32 ECF 567-21 Attachment, #33 ECF 567-22 Attachment, #34 ECF 567-23 Attachment, #35 ECF 567-24 Attachment, #36 ECF 567-25 Attachment, #37 ECF 567-26 Attachment, #38 ECF 567-27 Attachment, #39 ECF 567-28 Attachment, #40 ECF 567-29 Attachment, #41 ECF 567-30 Attachment, #42 ECF 567-31 Attachment, #43 ECF 567-32 Attachment, #44 ECF 567-33 Attachment, #45 ECF 567-34 Attachment, #46 ECF 567-35 Attachment, #47 ECF 567-36 Attachment, #48 ECF 567-37 Attachment, #49 ECF 567-38 Attachment, #50 ECF 567-39 Attachment, #51 ECF 567-40 Attachment, #52 ECF 567-41 Attachment, #53 ECF 567-42 Attachment, #54 ECF 567-43 Attachment, #55 ECF 567-44 Attachment, #56 ECF 567-45 Attachment, #57 ECF 567-46 Attachment, #58 ECF 567-47 Attachment, #59 ECF 567-48 Attachment, #60 ECF 567-49 Attachment, #61 ECF 567-50 Attachment, #62 ECF 567-51 Attachment)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
November 28, 2018 Filing 2 TRANSMITTAL of Record on Appeal by Bankruptcy Court for the District of Maryland. (Part 1) (Attachments: #1 Amended Transmittal, #2 Docket Sheet, #3 ECF 33 Motion to Lift Stay, #4 ECF 33-1 Attachment, #5 ECF 33-2 Attachment, #6 ECF 33-3 Attachment, #7 ECF 33-4 Attachment, #8 ECF 33-5 Attachment, #9 ECF 33-6 Attachment, #10 ECF 66 Debtor's Opposition to Creditor Paul C.Clark, Sr.'s Motion to Lift Stay, #11 ECF 66-1 Proposed Order, #12 ECF 124 Transcript of Hearing held on 6/9/16, #13 ECF 124-1 Notice of Requirement to Review Transcript, #14 ECF 264 Objection to Claim No. 46, #15 ECF 265 Objection to Claim No. 47, #16 ECF 266 Objection to Claim No. 48, #17 ECF 316 Objection to Objection to Claim No. 46 and Request for Hearing, #18 ECF 317 Opposition to Objection to Claim No. 47 and Request for Hearing, #19 ECF 318 Opposition to Objection to Claim No. 48 and Request for Hearing, #20 ECF 437 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #21 ECF 437-1 Memorandum in Support, #22 ECF 437-2 Proposed Order, #23 ECF 450 Creditors Opposition to Debtor's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #24 ECF 451 Creditors Memorandum in Support of Opposition to Debtor's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #25 ECF 451-1 Suggestion of Bankruptcy, #26 ECF 451-2 Case Information, #27 ECF 451-3 Case Information, #28 ECF 451-4 Affidavit, #29 ECF 460 Reply to Creditors Opposition to Debtor's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #30 ECF 540 Order Continuing Motion to Amend, Approving Stipulations Between the Parties, and Setting Status Conference, #31 ECF 544 Motion to Compel, #32 ECF 544-1 Notice of Deposition, #33 ECF 544-2 Return of Due Diligence, #34 ECF 544-3 Attachment, #35 ECF 544-4 Attachment, #36 ECF 544-5 Proposed Order, #37 ECF 545 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #38 ECF 545-1 Affidavit of Reuben Mezrich, #39 ECF 545-2 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #40 ECF 545-3 Memorandum in Support, #41 ECF 545-4 Exhibit A, #42 ECF 545-5 Exhibit H, #43 ECF 545-6 Proposed Order, #44 ECF 547 Emergency Request for a Telephonic Status Conference, #45 ECF 547-1 Exhibit 1, #46 ECF 547-2 Proposed Order, #47 ECF 549 Response to Request for a Telephonic Status Conference, #48 ECF 549-1 Attachment)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. (Baltimore). Bankruptcy Court case number 16-13049,, filed by Paul C. Clark, Sr, Rebecca Delorme, Paul Clark, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Deficiency Notice, #2 Line Identifying Orders being Appealed, #3 975-Final Order, #4 863-Order Denying Motion for Reconsideration, #5 862-Preliminary Order, #6 696-Order Denying Creditors, #7 694-Order Granting in Part and Denying in Park Creditors' First Motion in Limine, #8 651-Order Granting in Part Creditors' Motion to Strike, #9 649-Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Debor's Third Motion, #10 647-Order Granting Debtor's Second Motion, #11 628-Order Resolving Moton to Compel EMails, #12 603-Order Addressing Motion to Compel EMails, #13 591-Order Resolving Motion to Compel Deposition, #14 985-Notice of Cross Appeal, #15 Docket Report, #16 Initial Transmittal)(ko, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark et al v. Council of Unit Owners of the 100 Harborview Drive Condominium
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Paul C. Clark, Sr.
Represented By: Brennan C McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Paul Clark, Jr.
Represented By: Brennan C McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Rebecca Delorme
Represented By: Brennan C McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Council of Unit Owners of the 100 Harborview Drive Condominium
Represented By: Paul Sweeney
Represented By: James R Schraf
Represented By: Lisa Yonka Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?