O'Reilly v. Tsottles et al
Plaintiff: Matthew O'Reilly
Defendant: Adam Tsottles and Waste Management, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv03622
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 Consent to receive notice and service electronically by Matthew O'Reilly. The Court recommends that all documents received electronically be printed or saved for future reference.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Adam Tsottles and Waste Management, Inc.(c/hd 1/8/19 bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing Plaintiff to submit completed summons to the Clerk and directing the Clerk to prepare and return summons to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 12/17/2018. (c/m 12/17/18 bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
November 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Adam Tsottles, Waste Management, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637110854.), filed by Matthew O'Reilly. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kos, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Reilly v. Tsottles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Tsottles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waste Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew O'Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?