Nolasco et al v. Precision Pipeline Solutions, LLC

Plaintiff: Anthony Cabrera, Carlos Nolasco, Juan Pineda and Pedro Mundo
Defendant: Precision Pipeline Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv03754
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Precision Pipeline Solutions, LLC answer due 2/28/2019.. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 1/31/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
January 31, 2019 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, [1-2] Complaint by Precision Pipeline Solutions, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Niccolini, Robert)
December 12, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE re #6 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Precision Pipeline Solutions, LLC.(Ng, Connie)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Responsive pleading to [1-2] Complaint due on or before 1/31/19. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 12/11/2018. (dafs, Chambers)
December 10, 2018 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Precision Pipeline Solutions, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Niccolini, Robert)
December 7, 2018 Filing 7 Supplemental to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Precision Pipeline Solutions, LLC Complaint (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Return of Service, #3 Civil Non-Domestic Case Information Report)(Ng, Connie)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 12/7/2018. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 QC NOTICE: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Precision Pipeline Solutions, LLC was filed incorrectly. Each attachment must be specifically labeled (i.e. complaint, summons, etc). Please refile each attachment using the "Other Documents" category, select the "Supplemental" event, and link filing to 1 Notice of Removal. The first labeled attachment can be the main document and the other labeled documents as separate attachments. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
December 6, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge George Levi Russell, III. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Precision Pipeline Solutions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Vinci, SA, Corporate Parent Prime Utility Services, LLC for Precision Pipeline Solutions, LLC.(Niccolini, Robert)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Ross Niccolini on behalf of Precision Pipeline Solutions, LLC (Niccolini, Robert)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Connie May Ting Ng on behalf of Precision Pipeline Solutions, LLC (Ng, Connie)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore City, Maryland, case number 24-C-18-005750 OT. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7711795), filed by Precision Pipeline Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B-Addl Circuit Court Filing, #4 Exhibit C-Decl. of W. Michael Walker, #5 Exhibit D-Notice of Filing of Removal)(Ng, Connie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nolasco et al v. Precision Pipeline Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Cabrera
Represented By: Gregg Cohen Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Nolasco
Represented By: Gregg Cohen Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Pineda
Represented By: Gregg Cohen Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Mundo
Represented By: Gregg Cohen Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precision Pipeline Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Connie May Ting Ng
Represented By: Robert Ross Niccolini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?