Singfield v. Buck

Plaintiff: Harold Malcolm Singfield
Defendant: Carla Buck
Case Number: 1:2018cv03756
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to electronically send copy of Complaint and withhold service; DIRECTING counsel for defendants to notify court if service is accepted and to answer the Complaint ( re #1 Complaint filed by Harold Malcolm Singfield ). Attachments will be emailed to attorneys who have not entered their appearance and were sent this NEF. Attorneys should contact the court if they do not receive the attachments; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 1/18/2019. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)(c/m-01/18/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/18/2019: #1 Institutional Coordinator Letter) (jb5, Deputy Clerk).
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FILED IN ERROR- ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to electronically send copy of Complaint and withhold service; DIRECTING counsel for defendants to notify court if service is accepted and to answer the Complaint ( re #1 Complaint filed by Harold Malcolm Singfield ). Attachments will be emailed to attorneys who have not entered their appearance and were sent this NEF. Attorneys should contact the court if they do not receive the attachments; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 1/18/2019. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)(c/m-01/18/2019)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER giving Finance Officer at NBCI 21 days to file an inmate account summary information sheet for the past six months. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 12/28/2018. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)(c/m-12-28-2018)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Harold Malcolm Singfield(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carla Buck, filed by Harold Malcolm Singfield. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Case Summary, #2 Envelope)(jb5, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singfield v. Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Malcolm Singfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?