Mar-Chek, Inc. et al v. Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company et al

Plaintiff: Mar-Chek, Inc. and Mar-Chek II, Inc.
Defendant: M&T Bank Corporation, Branch Banking and Trust Company, Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company and Christina Lynn Cooper
Case Number: 1:2018cv03765
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Filing 48 RESPONSE in Opposition re #46 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Mar-Chek II, Inc., Mar-Chek, Inc. (Originally filed as #21 -Attachment 19)(km4s, Deputy Clerk)
January 23, 2019 Filing 47 RESPONSE in Opposition re #45 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Mar-Chek II, Inc., Mar-Chek, Inc. (Originally filed as #21 -Attachment 20)(km4s, Deputy Clerk)
January 22, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Branch Banking and Trust Company (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Moffet, Brian)
January 22, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by M&T Bank Corporation, Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support)(Lusby, Keith)
January 18, 2019 Filing 44 REPLY to Response to Motion re #30 MOTION to Remand and to the Extent Necessary, For Leave to Amend Complaint filed by Mar-Chek II, Inc., Mar-Chek, Inc..(Conti, Anthony)
January 18, 2019 Filing 43 RESPONSE re #28 Supplemental, Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by M&T Bank Corporation, Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company.(Heidelbach, James)
January 18, 2019 Filing 42 RESPONSE re #21 Supplemental,,,, #27 Supplemental, REPLY IN SUPPORT OF BB&T'S MOTION TO DISMISS, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (ECF Nos. 21-11, 21-12) filed by Branch Banking and Trust Company.(Brown, Michael)
January 18, 2019 Filing 41 (FILED IN ERROR) RESPONSE to Motion re #30 MOTION to Remand and to the Extent Necessary, For Leave to Amend Complaint filed by Mar-Chek II, Inc., Mar-Chek, Inc. (Conti, Anthony) Modified on 1/18/2019 (km4s, Deputy Clerk).
January 18, 2019 Filing 40 QC NOTICE: #39 Response in Support of Motion filed by Mar-Chek, Inc., Mar-Chek II, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **Please re-file using the event under Reponses and Replies Reply to Response to Motion. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
January 17, 2019 Filing 39 (FILED IN ERROR) RESPONSE in Support re #30 MOTION to Remand and to the Extent Necessary, For Leave to Amend Complaint filed by Mar-Chek II, Inc., Mar-Chek, Inc..(Conti, Anthony) Modified on 1/18/2019 (km4s, Deputy Clerk).
January 16, 2019 Filing 38 Supplemental to #30 MOTION to Remand filed by Mar-Chek II, Inc., Mar-Chek, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Conti, Anthony)
January 14, 2019 Filing 37 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mar-Chek, Inc., Mar-Chek II, Inc.. (Conti, Anthony)
January 14, 2019 Filing 36 QC NOTICE: #35 Affidavit of Service filed by Mar-Chek, Inc., Mar-Chek II, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **Please re-file documents by selecting Service of Process Summons Returned Executed. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
January 11, 2019 Filing 35 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Federal Court Summons, Complaint and CD of all Federal Filings served on Christina Lynn Cooper on 1/8/19, filed by Mar-Chek II, Inc., Mar-Chek, Inc. (Conti, Anthony) Modified on 1/14/2019 (km4s, Deputy Clerk).
January 7, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE by Branch Banking and Trust Company re #1 Notice of Removal, Certificate of Filing of State Court Papers (Brown, Michael)
January 4, 2019 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition re #30 MOTION to Remand filed by Branch Banking and Trust Company, M&T Bank Corporation, Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Lusby, Keith)
January 2, 2019 Filing 32 Summons Issued 21 days as to Christina Lynn Cooper.(km4s, Deputy Clerk)
January 2, 2019 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Withdraw Stipulation of Dismissal of Christina Cooper Without Prejudice REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE filed by Branch Banking and Trust Company, M&T Bank Corporation, Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company.(Brown, Michael)
December 21, 2018 Filing 30 MOTION to Remand by Mar-Chek II, Inc., Mar-Chek, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 18)(Conti, Anthony)
December 21, 2018 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Withdraw Stipulation of Dismissal of Christina Cooper Without Prejudice filed by Mar-Chek II, Inc., Mar-Chek, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Conti, Anthony)
December 21, 2018 Filing 28 Supplemental to #47 Response in Opposition, filed by Mar-Chek II, Inc., Mar-Chek, Inc. Supplement to Opposition to Defendants Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company and M&T Bank Corporation's Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Silvestri, Michael) Modified on 1/23/2019 (km4s, Deputy Clerk).
December 21, 2018 Filing 27 Supplemental to #48 Response in Opposition, filed by Mar-Chek II, Inc., Mar-Chek, Inc. Supplement to Opposition to Defendant Branch Banking and Trust Company's Motion to Dismiss, or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Silvestri, Michael) Modified on 1/23/2019 (km4s, Deputy Clerk).
December 19, 2018 Filing 26 Request for Conference (Brown, Michael)
December 14, 2018 Filing 25 RESPONSE re #16 MOTION to Withdraw Stipulation of Dismissal of Christina Cooper Without Prejudice RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION AND MOTION TO STRIKE filed by Branch Banking and Trust Company, M&T Bank Corporation, Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Michael)
December 14, 2018 Filing 24 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Mar-Chek II, Inc., Mar-Chek, Inc. (Conti, Anthony)
December 14, 2018 Filing 23 RESPONSE re #17 Response, #8 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Mar-Chek II, Inc., Mar-Chek, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6)(Conti, Anthony)
December 13, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE by Mar-Chek II, Inc., Mar-Chek, Inc. Request to issue Writ of Summons for Christina Lynn Cooper f/k/a Christina Lynn Stroud (Attachments: #1 Summons Proposed Summons)(Conti, Anthony)
December 12, 2018 Filing 21 Supplemental to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Branch Banking and Trust Company (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice of Appearance for B. Moffet, #2 Attachment Stipulation Regarding Time, #3 Attachment Consent Motion, #4 Attachment Order, #5 Attachment Attorney Appearance - No Fee, #6 Attachment Def Motion to Dismiss, #7 Attachment Motion for SJ, #8 Attachment Exhibit to Motion for SJ, #9 Attachment Memo in Suppport of SJ, #10 Attachment Memo in Support of Def Motion to Dismiss, #11 Attachment Memo in Support of Pltf Motion to Dismiss, #12 Attachment Plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss, #13 Attachment Consent Motion, #14 Attachment Notice of Service, #15 Attachment Consent Motion to Extend, #16 Attachment Consent Motion to Respond, #17 Attachment Order, #18 Attachment Motion, #19 Attachment Opposition, #20 Attachment Opposition, #21 Attachment Notice of Discovery, #22 Attachment Notice of Discovery, #23 Attachment Notice of Discovery, #24 Attachment Order, #25 Attachment Notice of Discovery, #26 Attachment Notice of Discovery, #27 Attachment Order, #28 Attachment Order)(Moffet, Brian)
December 12, 2018 Filing 20 Supplemental to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Branch Banking and Trust Company (Attachments: #1 Attachment Return of Service, #2 Attachment Deficiency Notice, #3 Attachment Deficiency Notice, #4 Attachment Deficiency Notice, #5 Attachment Deficiency Notice, #6 Attachment Deficiency Notice, #7 Attachment Deficiency Notice, #8 Attachment Deficiency Notice, #9 Attachment Deficiency Notice, #10 Attachment Notice of Service, #11 Attachment Notice of Service, #12 Attachment Notice of Service, #13 Attachment Notice of Service, #14 Attachment Notice of Service, #15 Attachment Notice of Service, #16 Attachment Order - Mediation, #17 Attachment Scheduling Order, #18 Attachment Return of Service, #19 Attachment Return of Service, #20 Attachment Notice of Deficiency, #21 Attachment Notice of Deficiency, #22 Attachment Affidavit of Service, #23 Attachment Supporting Exhibits to Affidavit, #24 Attachment Supporting Exhibits to Affidavit, #25 Attachment Answer to Complaint, #26 Attachment Attorney Appearance - no fee, #27 Attachment Motion to Excuse Party, #28 Attachment Amended Notice, #29 Attachment Amended Notice, #30 Attachment Stipulation Re Response Time, #31 Attachment Consent Motion, #32 Attachment Attorney Appearance, #33 Attachment Notice of Discovery, #34 Attachment Order, #35 Attachment Motion to Extend)(Moffet, Brian)
December 11, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian L Moffet on behalf of Branch Banking and Trust Company (Moffet, Brian)
December 11, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Benjamin Brown on behalf of Branch Banking and Trust Company (Brown, Michael)
December 11, 2018 Filing 17 RESPONSE re #8 Standing Order Concerning Removal JOINT RESPONSE filed by Branch Banking and Trust Company, M&T Bank Corporation, Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company.(Brown, Michael)
December 10, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Withdraw Stipulation of Dismissal of Christina Cooper Without Prejudice by Mar-Chek II, Inc., Mar-Chek, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5)(Conti, Anthony)
December 10, 2018 Filing 15 Supplemental to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by M&T Bank Corporation, Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal (Lusby, Keith)
December 10, 2018 Filing 14 Supplemental to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by M&T Bank Corporation, Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company Stipulation of Dismissal of Christina Cooper (Lusby, Keith)
December 10, 2018 Filing 13 Supplemental to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by M&T Bank Corporation, Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company Civil Cover Sheet (Lusby, Keith)
December 10, 2018 Filing 12 Supplemental to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by M&T Bank Corporation, Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company Summons to Branch Banking and Trust Company (Lusby, Keith)
December 10, 2018 Filing 11 Supplemental to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by M&T Bank Corporation, Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company Summons to Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company (Lusby, Keith)
December 10, 2018 Filing 10 Supplemental to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by M&T Bank Corporation, Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company Summons to M&T Bank Corporation (Lusby, Keith)
December 10, 2018 Filing 9 Supplemental to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by M&T Bank Corporation, Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company Complaint (Lusby, Keith)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 12/10/2018. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
December 10, 2018 Filing 7 QC NOTICE: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by M&T Bank Corporation, Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company was filed incorrectly. **Each attachment must be specifically labeled (i.e. complaint, summons, etc). Please refile each attachment using the "Other Documents" category, select the "Supplemental" event, and link filing to #1 Notice of Removal. The first labeled attachment can be the main document and the other labeled documents as separate attachments. File any pending motions as separate docket entries. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
December 7, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael James Silvestri on behalf of Mar-Chek II, Inc., Mar-Chek, Inc. (Silvestri, Michael)
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Michael Conti on behalf of Mar-Chek II, Inc., Mar-Chek, Inc. (Conti, Anthony)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Branch Banking and Trust Company (Brown, Michael)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company identifying Corporate Parent M&T Bank Corporation for Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company.(Lusby, Keith)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by M&T Bank Corporation (Lusby, Keith)
December 7, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge George Jarrod Hazel. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Anne Arundel County, case number C-02-CV-18-002175. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7713570), filed by Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company, M&T Bank Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Lusby, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mar-Chek, Inc. et al v. Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M&T Bank Corporation
Represented By: James T Heidelbach
Represented By: Keith Michael Lusby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Branch Banking and Trust Company
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Brown
Represented By: Brian L Moffet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company
Represented By: James T Heidelbach
Represented By: Keith Michael Lusby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Lynn Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mar-Chek, Inc.
Represented By: Michael James Silvestri
Represented By: Anthony Michael Conti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mar-Chek II, Inc.
Represented By: Michael James Silvestri
Represented By: Anthony Michael Conti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?