Edoff v. T-Mobile Northeast LLC et al

Plaintiff: Chad Edoff
Defendant: T-Mobile USA, Inc. and T-Mobile Northeast LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv03777
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: Maryland District Court
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 16 RESPONSE re #10 Order to Clarify Jurisdiction under CAFA filed by Chad Edoff. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Whitaker, Joshua)
January 16, 2019 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by T-Mobile Northeast LLC, T-Mobile USA, Inc..(Falzarano, Mia)
January 11, 2019 14 RESPONSE re #10 Order Directing T-Mobile to Clarify the Basis for Jurisdiction under CAFA filed by T-Mobile Northeast LLC, T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Muzio)(Falzarano, Mia)
January 2, 2019 13 RESPONSE re #11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Chad Edoff.(Whitaker, Joshua)
December 21, 2018 12 NOTICE by T-Mobile Northeast LLC, T-Mobile USA, Inc. in Compliance with this Court's Standing Order Concerning Removal (Falzarano, Mia)
December 14, 2018 11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by T-Mobile Northeast LLC, T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration, #2 Exhibit Muzio Declaration, #3 Exhibit A - 2016 Samsung Galaxy Purchase - Redacted, #4 Exhibit B- July 2017 EIP - Redacted, #5 Exhibit C - December 1017 EIP - Redacted, #6 Exhibit D - Terms and Conditions Sept 2016)(Frey, Brian)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order 10 ORDER directing counsel to clarify the basis for jurisdiction under CAFA by 1/11/2019. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 12/13/18. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order 9 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 12/11/18. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
December 10, 2018 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Mia Falzarano. Directing attorney Mia Falzarano to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 12/10/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 10, 2018 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kristine McAlister Brown. Directing attorney Kristine McAlister Brown to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 12/10/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 10, 2018 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Derin Bronson Dickerson. Directing attorney Derin Bronson Dickerson to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 12/10/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 10, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Ellen L. Hollander. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
December 7, 2018 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mia L. Falzarano (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7715817.) by T-Mobile Northeast LLC, T-Mobile USA, Inc.(Frey, Brian)
December 7, 2018 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kristine M. Brown (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7715816.) by T-Mobile Northeast LLC, T-Mobile USA, Inc.(Frey, Brian)
December 7, 2018 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Derin B. Dickerson (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7715814.) by T-Mobile Northeast LLC, T-Mobile USA, Inc.(Frey, Brian)
December 7, 2018 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by T-Mobile Northeast LLC, T-Mobile USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent T-Mobile US, Inc. for T-Mobile Northeast LLC, T-Mobile USA, Inc..(Frey, Brian)
December 7, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore City, case number 24-c-18-005506. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7715725), filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Declaration of Christopher Muzio)(Frey, Brian) Modified on 12/11/2018 (krs, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edoff v. T-Mobile Northeast LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Edoff
Represented By: Joshua G Whitaker
Represented By: Edward Nelson Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile USA, Inc.
Represented By: Brian D Frey
Represented By: Kristine McAlister Brown
Represented By: Derin Bronson Dickerson
Represented By: Mia L Falzarano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile Northeast LLC
Represented By: Brian D Frey
Represented By: Kristine McAlister Brown
Represented By: Derin Bronson Dickerson
Represented By: Mia L Falzarano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?