Buhari v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Sharafa Buhari
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2018cv03792
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the Government to ANSWER the Motion for Return of Property Within 60 days. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 12/27/2018. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)(c/m to Buhari 12.27.18)(copy of Order & Motion emailed to Michael C. Hanlon 12.27.18)(c/m to Finance Officer at Moshannon Valley 12.27.18)
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sharafa Buhari (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing the Clerk to send instructions and an application to proceed in forma pauperis to Buhari. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 12/12/2018. (c/m w/form 12/12/18 bmhs, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 12/12/2018 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Return of Property by Sharafa Buhari (jnls, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buhari v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharafa Buhari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?