McCormick & Company, Incorporated v. Primal Palate, LLC
Plaintiff: McCormick & Company, Incorporated
Defendant: Primal Palate, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv03799
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Filing 20 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by McCormick & Company, Incorporated(Busey, George)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 5/23/2019. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 1/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Informal Discovery Letter)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
January 2, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Primal Palate, LLC.(Lyon, Christopher)
January 2, 2019 Filing 17 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Primal Palate, LLC (Lyon, Christopher)
December 28, 2018 Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Joseph Venier. Directing attorney Joseph Venier to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 12/28/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 28, 2018 Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Steven Susser. Directing attorney Steven Susser to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 12/28/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 28, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joseph Venier (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7753471.) by Primal Palate, LLC(Lyon, Christopher)
December 28, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Steven Susser (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7753455.) by Primal Palate, LLC(Lyon, Christopher)
December 28, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J Lyon on behalf of Primal Palate, LLC (Lyon, Christopher)
December 17, 2018 Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Joyce Liou. Attorney Joyce Liou will receive a separate email with the previously issued CM/ECF login and password. Signed by Clerk on 12/17/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 17, 2018 Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jennifer Lee Taylor. Directing attorney Jennifer Lee Taylor to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 12/17/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 14, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joyce Liou (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7730327.) by McCormick & Company, Incorporated(Busey, George)
December 14, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jennifer Lee Taylor (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7730306.) by McCormick & Company, Incorporated(Busey, George)
December 13, 2018 Filing 7 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Busey, George)
December 12, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by McCormick & Company, Incorporated. Primal Palate, LLC served on 12/11/2018, answer due 1/2/2019.(Busey, George)
December 11, 2018 Filing 5 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by McCormick & Company, Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent McCormick & Company, Inc. for McCormick & Company, Incorporated.(Busey, George)
December 11, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Primal Palate, LLC.(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
December 11, 2018 Filing 3 QC NOTICE: #2 Notice (Other) filed by McCormick & Company, Incorporated was filed incorrectly. ***Please refile using the correct event under & Other Filings& Other Documents & Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
December 11, 2018 Deficiency Notice -- Report on Filing Patent/Trademark form (AO 120) has not been filed. The form is located at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/publications/DisplayForms.asp?ActiveTab=Civil . Please fully complete and file the form by selecting Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Report on Filing Patent/Trademark. The form must be filed by 12/18/2018 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 (FILED IN ERROR)NOTICE by McCormick & Company, Incorporated re #1 Complaint Plaintiff's Disclosure Statement (Busey, George) Modified on 12/11/2018 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk).
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Primal Palate, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7719001.), filed by McCormick & Company, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - G, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Busey, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCormick & Company, Incorporated v. Primal Palate, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primal Palate, LLC
Represented By: Steven Susser
Represented By: Joseph Venier
Represented By: Christopher J Lyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McCormick & Company, Incorporated
Represented By: George Brian Busey
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Taylor
Represented By: Joyce Liou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?