Teamsters Local 677 Health Services and Insurance Plan v. Friedman et al
Plaintiff: Teamsters Local 677 Health Services and Insurance Plan
Defendant: Christopher S. Ripley, J. Duncan Smith, Frederick G. Smith, Daniel C. Keith, Sinclair Broadcast Group, Inc., David D. Smith, Martin R. Leader, Robert E. Smith, Lawrence E. McCanna and Howard E. Friedman
Case Number: 1:2018cv03868
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Referring Judge: Deborah K Chasanow
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Teamsters Local 677 Health Services and Insurance Plan.(English, Melissa)
January 25, 2019 Filing 30 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #29 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Stephen M Juris. Attorney Stephen M Juris will receive a separate email with the previously issued CM/ECF login and password. Signed by Clerk on 1/25/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
January 22, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Stephen M. Juris (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7797216.) by Sinclair Broadcast Group, Inc.(Marder, Scott)
January 17, 2019 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT re #27 Response in Opposition to Motion, Declaration of David Y. Livshiz by Martin R. Leader (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of David Y. Livshiz in Support of Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration of David Y. Livshiz in Support of Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Declaration of David Y. Livshiz in Support of Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Declaration of David Y. Livshiz in Support of Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E to Declaration of David Y. Livshiz in Support of Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F to Declaration of David Y. Livshiz in Support of Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand)(Andrews, Philip)
January 17, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Martin R. Leader. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand)(Andrews, Philip)
January 14, 2019 Filing 26 Local Rule 103.5.a (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Andrews, Philip)
January 3, 2019 Filing 25 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kimberly Zelnick. Directing attorney Kimberly Zelnick to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 1/3/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
January 3, 2019 Filing 24 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Michael P. Sternheim. Signed by Clerk on 1/3/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
January 3, 2019 Filing 23 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Scott Luftglass. Directing attorney Scott Luftglass to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 1/3/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
January 3, 2019 Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Samuel P. Groner. Signed by Clerk on 1/3/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
January 2, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kimberly Zelnick (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7757960.) by Martin R. Leader(Andrews, Philip)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Joint Motion for Extension of Time, Proposed Schedule, and Request for Oral Argument related to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 1/2/19. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
December 28, 2018 Filing 19 RESPONSE re #3 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Martin R. Leader. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Andrews, Philip)
December 28, 2018 Filing 18 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time , Proposed Schedule and Request for Oral Argument on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Martin R. Leader (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Andrews, Philip)
December 28, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael P. Sternheim (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7753636.) by Sinclair Broadcast Group, Inc.(Marder, Scott)
December 28, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Scott B. Luftglass (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7753616.) by Sinclair Broadcast Group, Inc.(Marder, Scott)
December 28, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Samuel P. Groner (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7753575.) by Sinclair Broadcast Group, Inc.(Marder, Scott)
December 28, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE by Sinclair Broadcast Group, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, consent to removal (Marder, Scott)
December 27, 2018 Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of David Livshiz. Directing attorney David Livshiz to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 12/27/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 27, 2018 Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Aaron Marcu. Directing attorney Aaron Marcu to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 12/27/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 26, 2018 Filing 11 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Sinclair Broadcast Group, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Sinclair Television Group, Inc., Other Affiliate 1111 Light Street, LLC, Other Affiliate 1546 Mitchell Lane, LLC, Other Affiliate Acrodyne Technical Services, LLC, Other Affiliate ACC Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate Action TV, LLC, Other Affiliate Albany Tower, LLC, Other Affiliate Allegiance Capital L.P., Other Affiliate Allure At Jefferson, LLC, Other Affiliate Ashton Holding Company, LLC, Other Affiliate Bacova Road Apartments, LLC, Other Affiliate Bagby Investors, LLC, Other Affiliate Bay Creek Realty, LLC, Other Affiliate Bay Creek South, LLC, Other Affiliate Birmingham (WABM-TV) Licensee, Inc., Other Affiliate Cape Charles Capital, LLC, Other Affiliate Chesapeake Media I, LLC, Other Affiliate Chesapeake Television Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate Circa, LLC, Other Affiliate Circa 1605 Canada, Inc., Other Affiliate CometTV, LLC, Other Affiliate CVP Cross Street, LLC, Other Affiliate Chesapeake Bay Communications, LLC, Other Affiliate CIA-Jefferson, LLC, Other Affiliate College Gardens Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate College Gardens Residential Investments, LLC, Other Affiliate CVP Mitchell, LLC, Other Affiliate CVP Nazarene, LLC, Other Affiliate CVP Security Boulevard, LLC, Other Affiliate Dielectric, LLC, Other Affiliate Drive Auto, LLC, Other Affiliate Edinburgh Apartments, LLC, Other Affiliate Fisher Mills, Inc., Other Affiliate Fisher Properties, Inc., Other Affiliate Full Measure, LLC, Other Affiliate Harrisburg Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate Harrisburg Television, Inc., Other Affiliate Heartland Tower Company, LLC, Other Affiliate HG Sinclair Norfolk Office Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Highwoods Joint Venture, Other Affiliate Holdco RCC, LLC, Other Affiliate Holdco RCK, LLC, Other Affiliate Hummingbird, LLC, Other Affiliate Illinois Television, LLC, Other Affiliate Independence Acquisition, LLC, Other Affiliate Jefferson Park Development, LLC, Other Affiliate JTPI Investments, LLC, Other Affiliate KABB Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate KAME, LLC, Other Affiliate KATV, LLC, Other Affiliate KATV Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate KBSI Licensee L.P., Other Affiliate KDBC Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate KDNL Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate KDSM Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate KDSM, LLC, Other Affiliate KENV, LLC, Other Affiliate KEYE Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate Keyser - 1100 Fleet Street, LLC, Other Affiliate Keyser - Allure, LLC, Other Affiliate Keyser - Bacova, LLC, Other Affiliate Keyser - BC Rental, LLC, Other Affiliate Keyser - Edinburgh, LLC, Other Affiliate Keyser - First Mariner, LLC, Other Affiliate Keyser Capital, LLC, Other Affiliate Keyser-Ashton, LLC, Other Affiliate Keyser-Bagby, LLC, Other Affiliate Keyser-Bay Creek, LLC, Other Affiliate Keyser - CS, LLC, Other Affiliate Keyser - FGP, LLC, Other Affiliate Keyser-Harbor WTC, LLC, Other Affiliate Keyser - Jefferson, LLC, Other Affiliate Keyser-Kline JTP, LLC, Other Affiliate Keyser - MSA, LLC, Other Affiliate Keyser - Pembroke, LLC, Other Affiliate Keyser - Premium, LLC, Other Affiliate Keyser - Rockville, LLC, Other Affiliate Keyser-Triangle Sign, LLC, Other Affiliate Keyser - WE, LLC, Other Affiliate Montgomery Square Acquisitions, LLC, Other Affiliate KFDM Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate KFOX Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate KFRE Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate KFXA Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate KGAN Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate KGBT Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate KHGI Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate KHQA Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate KJZZ Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate KLGT Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate KMPH Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate KOCB Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate KOKH Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate KOKH, LLC, Other Affiliate KPTH Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate KPTM Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate KRCG Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate KRNV, LLC, Other Affiliate KRXI, LLC, Other Affiliate KRXI Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate KSAS Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate KTUL, LLC, Other Affiliate KTUL Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate KTVL Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate KTVO Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate KUPN Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate KUQI Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate KUTV Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate KVII Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate KVCW, LLC, Other Affiliate KVMY, LLC, Other Affiliate Milwaukee Television, LLC, Other Affiliate New York Television, Inc., Other Affiliate North East Commons, LLC, Other Affiliate Obey Creek Ventures, LLC, Other Affiliate ONE Media, LLC, Other Affiliate ONE Media 3.0, LLC, Other Affiliate Owings Woods, LLC, Other Affiliate Perpetual Corporation, Other Affiliate QW Properties, LLC, Other Affiliate Raleigh (WRDC-TV) Licensee, Inc., Other Affiliate Red Run Ventures, LLC, Other Affiliate Ring of Honor Wrestling Entertainment, LLC, Other Affiliate San Antonio Television, LLC, Other Affiliate Security Boulevard Ventures, LLC, Other Affiliate Sinclair Acquisition IX, Inc., Other Affiliate Sinclair Acquisition VII, Inc., Other Affiliate Sinclair Acquisition VIII, Inc., Other Affiliate Sinclair Bakersfield Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate Sinclair Boise Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate Sinclair Broadcasting of Seattle, LLC, Other Affiliate Sinclair-California Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate Sinclair Communications, LLC, Other Affiliate Sinclair Digital Agency, LLC, Other Affiliate Sinclair Digital News, LLC, Other Affiliate Sinclair Digital Group, LLC, Other Affiliate Spectrum Co, LLC, Other Affiliate Sinclair Eugene Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate Sinclair Escrow, LLC, Other Affiliate Sinclair Investment Group, LLC, Other Affiliate Sinclair Kennewick Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate Sinclair La Grande Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate Sinclair Lewiston Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate Sinclair Media III, Inc., Other Affiliate Sinclair Media VI, Inc., Other Affiliate Sinclair Media Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate Sinclair Media of Boise, LLC, Other Affiliate Sinclair Media of Seattle, LLC, Other Affiliate Sinclair Media of Washington, LLC, Other Affiliate Sinclair Networks Group, LLC, Other Affiliate Sinclair Portland Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate Sinclair Programming Company, LLC, Other Affiliate Sinclair Properties, LLC, Other Affiliate Sinclair Radio of Seattle, LLC, Other Affiliate Sinclair Seattle Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate Sinclair Television Media, Inc., Other Affiliate Sinclair Television of Abilene, LLC, Other Affiliate Sinclair Television of Bristol, LLC, Other Affiliate Sinclair Television of California, LLC, Other Affiliate Sinclair Television of El Paso, LLC, Other Affiliate Sinclair Television of Fresno, LLC, Other Affiliate Sinclair Television of Illinois, LLC, Other Affiliate Sinclair Television of Montana, LLC, Other Affiliate Sinclair Television of New Bern, LLC, Other Affiliate Sinclair Television of Omaha, LLC, Other Affiliate Sinclair Television of Oregon, LLC, Other Affiliate Sinclair Television of Portland, LLC, Other Affiliate Sinclair Television of Seattle, Inc., Other Affiliate Sinclair Television of Washington, Inc., Other Affiliate Sinclair Television Stations, LLC, Other Affiliate Sinclair Yakima Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate Sinclair-CVP, LLC, Other Affiliate Skylar Development, LLC, Other Affiliate South West Oregon Television Broadcasting Corporation, Other Affiliate Starter-Annapolis, LLC, Other Affiliate Starter-Chapel Hill, LLC, Other Affiliate Tall Tower, LLC, Other Affiliate TBD TV, LLC, Other Affiliate Texas Tall Tower Corp, Other Affiliate The Tennis Channel, Inc., Other Affiliate The Tennis Channel Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Tornante-Sinclair LLC, Other Affiliate Towson Row, LLC, Other Affiliate Travis Tower, LLP, Other Affiliate Triangle Sign & Service, LLC, Other Affiliate WACH Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WBMA Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WCGV Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WCHS Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WCTI Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WCWB Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WCWF Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WCWN Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WDKA Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WDKY Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WEAR Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate West Coast Digital, LLC, Other Affiliate WFGX Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WFXL Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WGFL Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WGME Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WGME, Inc., Other Affiliate WGXA Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WHOI Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WICD Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WICS Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WJAC Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WJAR Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WKEF Licensee L.P., Other Affiliate WKRC Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WLFL Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WLOS Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WLUK Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WMMP Licensee L.P., Other Affiliate WMSN Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WNAB Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WNWO Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WOAI Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WOLF Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WPBN Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WPDE Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WPEC Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WPGH Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WQMY Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WRDC, LLC, Other Affiliate WRGB Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WRGT Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WRLH Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WSBT Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WSET Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WSMH Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WSMH, Inc., Other Affiliate WSTQ Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WSYX Licensee, Inc., Other Affiliate WTGS Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WTOV Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WTTO Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WTVC Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WTVX, Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WTVZ Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WTWC Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WUCW, LLC, Other Affiliate WUHF Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WUPN Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WUTV Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WUXP Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WVAH Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WVTV Licensee, Inc., Other Affiliate WWHO Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WWMT Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WXLV Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate WZTV Licensee, LLC, Other Affiliate Samson Merger Sub, Inc., Other Affiliate Water's Edge Holding, LLC, Other Affiliate WSTR Acquisition, LLC
December 26, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott H Marder on behalf of Sinclair Broadcast Group, Inc. (Marder, Scott)
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David Livshiz (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7747857.) by Martin R. Leader(Andrews, Philip)
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Aaron Marcu (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7747856.) by Martin R. Leader(Andrews, Philip)
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Martin R. Leader (Andrews, Philip)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Teamsters Local 677 Health Services and Insurance Plan (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(English, Melissa)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Lynn English on behalf of Teamsters Local 677 Health Services and Insurance Plan (English, Melissa)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Paul Smith on behalf of Teamsters Local 677 Health Services and Insurance Plan (Smith, Michael)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Standing Order Concerning Removal re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Martin R. Leader. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 12/19/2018. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
December 19, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge Richard D. Bennett. Judge Deborah K. Chasanow no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.5.a (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Andrews, Philip)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Maryland for Baltimore County, case number 03-C-18-12119. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7731721), filed by Martin R. Leader. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Andrews, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teamsters Local 677 Health Services and Insurance Plan v. Friedman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher S. Ripley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Duncan Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick G. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel C. Keith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sinclair Broadcast Group, Inc.
Represented By: Scott H Marder
Represented By: Stephen M Juris
Represented By: Scott Luftglass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin R. Leader
Represented By: Philip M Andrews
Represented By: Allison Marie Midei
Represented By: Aaron Marcu
Represented By: David Livshiz
Represented By: Kimberly Zelnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence E. McCanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard E. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teamsters Local 677 Health Services and Insurance Plan
Represented By: Melissa Lynn English
Represented By: Michael Paul Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?