Little v. Del Toro et al
Plaintiff: Lawrence Little
Defendant: Jerome Jones, Donald E. Terry, Jr. and Miguel Cervantes Del Toro
Case Number: 1:2018cv03983
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Referring Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lawrence Little. Miguel Cervantes Del Toro served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019.(hmls, Deputy Clerk)
February 13, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued 21 days as to Miguel Cervantes Del Toro, Jerome Jones, Donald E. Terry, Jr. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Directing Clerk to issue summons and USM to effectuate service of process on defendants. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 2/13/2019. (c/m 2/13/19 jnls, Deputy Clerk)
February 5, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Richard D. Bennett. Judge Ellen L. Hollander no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Reconsideration; By February 19, 2019, Plaintiff SHALL SUBMIT three copies of his Complaint for service of process on Defendants. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 2/4/2019. (c/m 2/4/19 jnls, Deputy Clerk)
January 31, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Reconsideration by Lawrence Little (285 USM forms and proposed summons submitted) (jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/4/2019: #1 Proposed summons and USM forms) (jnls, Deputy Clerk).
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Dismissing suit without prejudice. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 1/28/2019. (c/m 1/28/19 jnls, Deputy Clerk)
January 3, 2019 Filing 4 Supplement to #1 Complaint re: 18-cv-3985 case per #3 Order. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting (2) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis in case ELH-18-3983; consolidating ELH-18-3984 and ELH-18-3985 under ELH-18-3983; closing ELH-18-3984 and ELH-18-3985; granting plaintiff 21 days from the date of this order to complete forms, summons and return to Clerk with service copies. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 1/3/2019. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-03983-ELH, 1:18-cv-03984-ELH (c/m as directed 1/4/19 jnls, Deputy Clerk)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lawrence Little(slss, Deputy Clerk)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Miguel Cervantes Del Toro, Jerome Jones, Donald E. Terry and Jr., filed by Lawrence Little. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(slss, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Little v. Del Toro et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerome Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald E. Terry, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miguel Cervantes Del Toro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?