Stanton v. Bye et al
Plaintiff: Karen Stanton
Defendant: FRED L BYE, MASON-DIXON PERIODONTICS & IMPLANTS, LLC and Fred L. Bye
Case Number: 1:2019cv00146
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Filing 7 Miscellaneous Correspondence to counsel advising of a conference call to discuss attached proposed scheduling order. Counsel are requested to confirm with Chambers their participation. (Blake, Catherine)
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Mason-Dixon Periodontics & Implants, LLC (Keating, Edwin)
February 19, 2019 Deficiency Notice to defendants -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 2/26/2019 (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
February 18, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Fred L. Bye, Mason-Dixon Periodontics & Implants, LLC.(Keating, Edwin)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Fred L. Bye and Mason-Dixon Periodontics & Implants, LLC answers due on or before 2/18/2019. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 2/7/2019. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer until February 18, 2019 by Fred L. Bye, Mason-Dixon Periodontics & Implants, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Keenan, Siobhan)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Fred L. Bye, Mason-Dixon Periodontics & Implants, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(hmls, Deputy Clerk)
January 15, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Catherine C. Blake. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7785378.), filed by Karen Stanton. (Attachments: #1 Summons 1, #2 Summons 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibits 1-4, #4 Cover Letter cover letter, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Cover sheet)(Goldberg, Fred)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanton v. Bye et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRED L BYE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MASON-DIXON PERIODONTICS & IMPLANTS, LLC
Represented By: Edwin Lawrence Keating, III
Represented By: Siobhan R Keenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred L. Bye
Represented By: Edwin Lawrence Keating, III
Represented By: Siobhan R Keenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Stanton
Represented By: Fred B Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?