United States for the use and benefit of Mumford & Miller Concrete, Inc. v. Travelers Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: United States for the use and benefit of Mumford & Miller Concrete, Inc. and Mumford & Miller Concrete, Inc.
Defendant: Travelers Insurance Company, Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland/Zurich American Insurance Company, Federal Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, XL Specialty Insurance Company and The Continental Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00182
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
0 Judge: A David Copperthite
1 Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3131
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 27 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by XL Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent XL Reinsurance America Inc., Corporate Parent XL Group Ltd., Corporate Parent X.L. America, Inc., Corporate Parent XL Bermuda Ltd, Corporate Parent Exel Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent XLIT Ltd, Corporate Parent AXA SA for XL Specialty Insurance Company.(Mervis, Jeffrey)
March 14, 2019 Filing 26 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Federal Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Corporate Parent Chubb INA Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Chubb Group Holdings, Inc. for Federal Insurance Company.(Mervis, Jeffrey)
March 14, 2019 Filing 25 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Travelers Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies Inc, Corporate Parent Travelers Casualty & Surety Co. for Travelers Insurance Company.(Mervis, Jeffrey)
March 14, 2019 Filing 24 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holding, Inc. for Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(Mervis, Jeffrey)
March 13, 2019 Filing 23 QC NOTICE: #16 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, #18 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Travelers Insurance Company, #20 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Federal Insurance Company, #22 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by XL Specialty Insurance Company was filed incorrectly. **The Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement needs to be refiled and the corporate parent and/or affiliations need to be entered when the system prompts you. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
March 12, 2019 Filing 22 (FILED IN ERROR) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by XL Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent XL Reinsurance America Inc. for XL Specialty Insurance Company.(Mervis, Jeffrey) Modified on 3/13/2019 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
March 12, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM to Counsel scheduling a conference call. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 3/12/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
March 12, 2019 Filing 20 (FILED IN ERROR) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Federal Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Chubb INA Holdings, Inc. for Federal Insurance Company.(Mervis, Jeffrey) Modified on 3/13/2019 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
March 12, 2019 Filing 19 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by The Continental Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent CNA Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent Lowes Corporation for The Continental Insurance Company.(Mervis, Jeffrey)
March 12, 2019 Filing 18 (FILED IN ERROR) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Travelers Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Casualty & Surety Co. for Travelers Insurance Company.(Mervis, Jeffrey) Modified on 3/13/2019 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
March 12, 2019 Filing 17 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland/Zurich American Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc., a Delaware corporation, Corporate Parent Zurich America Insurance Company for Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland/Zurich American Insurance Company.(Mervis, Jeffrey)
March 12, 2019 Filing 16 (FILED IN ERROR) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. for Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(Mervis, Jeffrey) Modified on 3/13/2019 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
March 12, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Federal Insurance Company, Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland/Zurich American Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, The Continental Insurance Company, Travelers Insurance Company, XL Specialty Insurance Company.(Mervis, Jeffrey)
March 6, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Ellen L. Hollander. Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. Federal Insurance Company, Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland/Zurich American Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, The Continental Insurance Company, Travelers Insurance Company, XL Specialty Insurance Company or counsel for Federal Insurance Company, Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland/Zurich American Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, The Continental Insurance Company, Travelers Insurance Company, XL Specialty Insurance Company are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 3/12/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 2/21/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
February 19, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Federal Insurance Company, Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland/Zurich American Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, The Continental Insurance Company, Travelers Insurance Company, XL Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mervis, Jeffrey)
February 15, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mumford & Miller Concrete, Inc.. Federal Insurance Company served on 1/29/2019, answer due 2/19/2019; Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland/Zurich American Insurance Company served on 1/29/2019, answer due 2/19/2019; Liberty Mutual Insurance Company served on 1/29/2019, answer due 2/19/2019; The Continental Insurance Company served on 1/29/2019, answer due 2/19/2019; Travelers Insurance Company served on 1/29/2019, answer due 2/19/2019; XL Specialty Insurance Company served on 1/29/2019, answer due 2/19/2019.(Kovars, Joseph)
January 29, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Reissued as to Federal Insurance Company, Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland/Zurich American Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, The Continental Insurance Company, Travelers Insurance Company, XL Specialty Insurance Company.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 Correspondence re: reissuance of Summonses (Attachments: #1 Summons (Federal), #2 Summons (Fidelity), #3 Summons (Liberty), #4 Summons (Continental), #5 Summons (Travelers), #6 Summons (XL))(Cassilly, Matthew)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 1/23/2019. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. Mumford & Miller Concrete, Inc. or counsel for Mumford & Miller Concrete, Inc. are directed to the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil & Other Filings & Other Documents & 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil & Other Filings & Other Documents & 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 2/6/2019. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Federal Insurance Company, Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland/Zurich American Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, The Continental Insurance Company, Travelers Insurance Company, XL Specialty Insurance Company.(ko, Deputy Clerk)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Bruce Cassilly on behalf of United States for the use and benefit of Mumford & Miller Concrete, Inc. (Cassilly, Matthew)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by United States for the use and benefit of Mumford & Miller Concrete, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Mumford & Miller Concrete, Inc. for United States for the use and benefit of Mumford & Miller Concrete, Inc..(Kovars, Joseph)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Federal Insurance Company, Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland/Zurich American Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, The Continental Insurance Company, Travelers Insurance Company, XL Specialty Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7793059.), filed by United States for the use and benefit of Mumford & Miller Concrete, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit B-1, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons Federal Insurance, #6 Summons Fidelity and Deposit, #7 Summons Liberty Mutual, #8 Summons Continental Insurance, #9 Summons Travelers Insurance, #10 Summons XL Specialty)(Kovars, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States for the use and benefit of Mumford & Miller Concrete, Inc. v. Travelers Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States for the use and benefit of Mumford & Miller Concrete, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Bruce Cassilly
Represented By: Joseph C Kovars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mumford & Miller Concrete, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Bruce Cassilly
Represented By: Joseph C Kovars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey M Mervis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland/Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey M Mervis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey M Mervis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey M Mervis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XL Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey M Mervis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Continental Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey M Mervis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?