Britt v. Brennan

Plaintiff: JoAnn D. Britt
Defendant: Megan J. Brennan
Case Number: 1:2019cv00401
Filed: February 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: A David Copperthite
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 23 Summons Issued 60 days as to Megan J. Brennan, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Corrected Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 4/4/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
April 3, 2019 Filing 21 Corrected MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JoAnn D. Britt(Cox, Daniel)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting Plaintiff 7 days to file a signed financial affidavit; and denying without prejudice to refiling #16 #18 Plaintiff's Motions for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 3/28/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING Show Cause Hearing re: #9 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 3/4/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
March 4, 2019 Filing 18 Corrected MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JoAnn D. Britt(Cox, Daniel)
March 4, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JoAnn D. Britt(Cox, Daniel)
March 4, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by JoAnn D. Britt CORRECTED NOTICE of intent to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, and for a Jury Trial (Cox, Daniel)
March 4, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by JoAnn D. Britt of intent to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, and for a Jury Trial (Cox, Daniel)
March 1, 2019 Filing 13 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by JoAnn D. Britt was filed incorrectly. Filing Fee Not Paid. Submit filing fee. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
February 28, 2019 The case of Britt v. Brennan, has been opened in the District of Maryland. The case number is ADC-19-401. PLEASE NOTE: You must pay the case filing fee within 48 hours. To pay online, select the event Civil Case Filing Fee which is found under Civil Events --> Other Filings --> Other Documents. Otherwise, forward a check made payable to Clerk, U.S. District Court and note the assigned case number on the check or cover letter. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
February 28, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: 11 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. Please correct the following error(s):**Incorrect form used - complete the form Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here and refile using the event 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge located in Other Documents >25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
February 27, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by JoAnn D. Britt re #1 Complaint Summons to U.S. Attorney (Cox, Daniel)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing JoAnn D. Britt to show cause for failure to comply with #Standing Order 2018-04. Show Cause Hearing set for 3/29/2019 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before the Chambers Judge. This Order shall be vacated if JoAnn D. Britt files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 2/26/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 QC NOTICE: #5 Notice (Other) filed by JoAnn D. Britt was filed incorrectly. **Summons not submitted for the U.S. Attorney. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
February 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by JoAnn D. Britt re #1 Complaint Summons to Attorney General of the United States (Cox, Daniel)
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 QC NOTICE: #5 Notice filed by JoAnn D. Britt was filed incorrectly. **Summons not submitted for the U.S. Attorney and the U.S. Attorney General. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by JoAnn D. Britt re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet and Summons (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Cox, Daniel)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 2/11/2019. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. JoAnn D. Britt or counsel for JoAnn D. Britt are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 2/25/2019. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by JoAnn D. Britt was filed incorrectly. Summons and Civil Cover Sheet not filed. Please file Summons and Civil Cover Sheet using the Notice entry and attache the Summons and Civil Cover Sheet to that entry. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
February 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Discrimination & Retaliation against Megan J. Brennan, filed by JoAnn Britt.(Cox, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Britt v. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JoAnn D. Britt
Represented By: Daniel Lewis Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan J. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?