Meade Communities, LLC v. Calypso

Plaintiff: Meade Communities, LLC
Defendant: Carleen Calypso
Case Number: 1:2019cv00404
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: J Mark Coulson
Referring Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 14 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE: All Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 4/5/2019. (daws, Chambers)
April 5, 2019 Filing 12 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Smith, Adam)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher for Settlement. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 4/4/2019. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Directing Parties to Submit Magistrate Judge Consent Form(s) re #9 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 4/4/2019. (c/m 4/4/19 cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson for all Proceedings. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 4/4/2019. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 3, 2019 Filing 8 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Smith, Adam)
April 3, 2019 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT Joint by Meade Communities, LLC(Smith, Adam)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 4/5/2019. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 3/15/2019. (c/m 3/15/19 jnls, Deputy Clerk)
March 13, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Carleen Calypso. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Meade Communities, LLC. Carleen Calypso served on 2/24/2019, answer due 3/18/2019.(Smith, Adam)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Carleen Calypso.(slss, Deputy Clerk)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Meade Communities, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Corvias Military Living, LLC, Other Affiliate Corvias Management Army, LLC for Meade Communities, LLC.(Smith, Adam)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7834027.), filed by Meade Communities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Summons - Calypso, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meade Communities, LLC v. Calypso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meade Communities, LLC
Represented By: Adam Gregory Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carleen Calypso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?