Bird v. Ocwen Federal Bank, FSB et al
Plaintiff: Paul Charles Bird, Sr.
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, Fairbanks Capital Management, Inc., The Huntington National Bank, Homecomings Financial LLC, Ocwen Federal Bank, FSB, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Residential Funding Company, LLC, Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A., Homecomings Financial, LLC, J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, Huntington National Bank, Ocwen Federal Bank and Residential Funding Co. LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00464
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Filing 33 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #32 MOTION to Strike #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION for Summary Judgment , RESPONSE in Opposition filed by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank.(Neal, Aaron)
April 2, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Strike #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and MOTION for Summary Judgment by Paul Charles Bird, Sr (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MARGINAL ORDER Approving #30 LINE OF DISMISSAL with prejudice as to Defendant Fairbanks Capital Management, Inc. filed by Paul Charles Bird, Sr. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 4/1/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
March 29, 2019 Filing 30 LINE OF DISMISSAL with prejudice as to Defendant Fairbanks Capital Management, Inc. by Paul Charles Bird, Sr. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 29, 2019 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 MOTION to Strike #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Ocwen Federal Bank.(Troost, Thomas)
March 15, 2019 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION to Strike #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION for Summary Judgment , #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION for Summary Judgment , RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A., Specialized Loan Servicing LLC.(Neal, Aaron)
March 14, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Strike #12 MOTION of Ocwen Federal Bank to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Paul Charles Bird, Sr (Attachments: #1 Exhibit N, #2 Exhibit O) (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael Evan Blumenfeld terminated. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 3/12/2019. (c/m 3/13/19 jnls, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 3/13/2019 (jnls, Deputy Clerk).
March 12, 2019 Filing 25 Rule 12/56 letter mailed to Paul Charles Bird, Sr (c/m 3/12/19 jnls, Deputy Clerk)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying #20 Motion of plaintiff for Judgment by Default construed as a Request for Clerk's Entry of Default. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 3/12/2019. (c/m 3/12/19 jnls, Deputy Clerk)
March 12, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order)(Neal, Aaron)
March 12, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld, Michael)
March 11, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Drew Neal on behalf of J.P. Morgan Chase Bank (Neal, Aaron)
March 6, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense by Paul Charles Bird, Sr (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
March 6, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Strike #9 MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION for Summary Judgment < by Paul Charles Bird, Sr (Attachments: #1 Exhibit N, #2 Exhibit O) (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 2/28/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
February 27, 2019 Filing 17 Rule 12/56 letter mailed to Paul Charles Bird, Sr (c/m 2/27/19 jnls, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2019 Filing 16 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for J.P. Morgan Chase Bank.(Blumenfeld, Michael)
February 26, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld, Michael)
February 26, 2019 Filing 14 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Ocwen Federal Bank identifying Corporate Parent Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Corporate Parent Ocwen Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent Ocwen Mortgage Services, Inc. for Ocwen Federal Bank.(Troost, Thomas)
February 26, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Evan Blumenfeld on behalf of J.P. Morgan Chase Bank (Blumenfeld, Michael)
February 26, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Ocwen Federal Bank (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Troost, Thomas)
February 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Troost on behalf of Ocwen Federal Bank (Troost, Thomas)
February 21, 2019 Filing 10 Rule 12/56 letter mailed to Paul Charles Bird, Sr (c/m 2/21/19 jnls, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION for Summary Judgment by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A., Specialized Loan Servicing LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Appendix of Exhibits, #22 Memorandum, #23 Proposed Order)(Neal, Aaron)
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 Correspondence from Clerk to Plaintiff re: Removal Notification (c/m 2/21/19)(ds3, Deputy Clerk)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 Correspondence re: Standing Order Concerning Removal (Neal, Aaron)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 2/19/2019. (ds3, Deputy Clerk)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 Supplemental to #1 Notice of Removal filed by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A., Specialized Loan Servicing LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M)(Neal, Aaron)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 QC NOTICE: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Paul Charles Bird, Sr. was filed incorrectly. *Each state court document must be a separate attachment and must be specifically labeled (i.e. complaint, summons, etc). Please refile each attachment selecting Other Documents > Supplemental and link filing to 1 Notice of Removal. The first labeled attachment can be the main document and the other labeled documents as separate attachments. File any pending motions as separate docket entries. (ds3, Deputy Clerk)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC identifying Corporate Parent Computershare Limited, Corporate Parent Specialized Loan Servicing Holdings LLC for Specialized Loan Servicing LLC.(Neal, Aaron)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation for Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A..(Neal, Aaron)
February 15, 2019 Case assigned to Judge George Levi Russell, III. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7844039), filed by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association FKA The Bank of New York Trust Company, N.A and Specialized Loan Servicing LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Neal, Aaron) Modified on 2/21/2019 (ds3, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bird v. Ocwen Federal Bank, FSB et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Aaron Drew Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairbanks Capital Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Huntington National Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homecomings Financial LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Federal Bank, FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residential Funding Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A.
Represented By: Aaron Drew Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homecomings Financial, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Chase Bank
Represented By: Aaron Drew Neal
Represented By: Michael Evan Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington National Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Federal Bank
Represented By: Thomas Troost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residential Funding Co. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Charles Bird, Sr.
Represented By: Aaron Drew Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?