Jones v. The Coca-Cola Company et al

Plaintiff: Donnell Jones
Defendant: The Coca-Cola Company, Coca-Cola Refreshments, USA, Inc., CCBCC Operations, LLC and CCBCC, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00467
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 20 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint And Jury Demand by CCBCC Operations, LLC, CCBCC, Inc., Coca-Cola Refreshments, USA, Inc., The Coca-Cola Company.(Wilson, Brent)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #18 Joint MOTION to Lift Stay and for Extension of Time to File Answer. CCBCC, Inc. answer extended through and including 4/12/2019. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 3/26/2019. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
March 26, 2019 Filing 18 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CCBCC Operations, LLC, CCBCC, Inc., Coca-Cola Refreshments, USA, Inc., The Coca-Cola Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Wilson, Brent)
March 18, 2019 Filing 17 Local Rule 103.5 CERTIFICATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Order for Mediation, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Scheduling Order)(McCallum, Darryl)
March 12, 2019 Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite no longer assigned to case. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
March 12, 2019 Settlement Conference held on 3/12/2019 before Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
March 12, 2019 Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Brent Wilson. Directing attorney Brent Wilson to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/12/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
March 11, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Darryl G. McCallum (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7883733.) by CCBCC Operations, LLC, CCBCC, Inc., Coca-Cola Refreshments, USA, Inc., The Coca-Cola Company(McCallum, Darryl)
March 7, 2019 [FILED IN ERROR - duplicate entry] Phone calls with counsel re settlement held on 3/7/2019 before Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. (krs, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 3/8/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
March 7, 2019 Telephone Conference re: Settlement held on 3/7/2019 before Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
February 28, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE re #4 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by CCBCC, Inc..(McCallum, Darryl)
February 26, 2019 Filing 13 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by CCBCC, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Coca Cola Company, Other Affiliate Red Classic Services, LLC, Other Affiliate Swift Water Logistics, Inc., Other Affiliate Data Ventures, Inc. for CCBCC, Inc..(McCallum, Darryl)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 2/21/2019. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Joint Motion to Stay the Proceedings Pending a Mediation and to Schedule a Mediation before a Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 2/21/19. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 2/21/19. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite for Settlement. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 2/21/2019. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
February 20, 2019 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Stay the proceedings pending a mediation and to schedule a mediation before a Magistrate Judge by Donnell Jones (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Leppler, John)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal by Donnell Jones (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Leppler, John)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 [FILED IN ERROR - DUPLICATE] NOTICE of Appearance by John Justin Leppler on behalf of Donnell Jones (Leppler, John) Modified on 2/21/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 [FILED IN ERROR - DUPLICATE] NOTICE of Appearance by John Justin Leppler on behalf of Donnell Jones (Leppler, John) Modified on 2/21/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 2/19/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John Justin Leppler on behalf of Donnell Jones (Leppler, John)
February 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by CCBCC Operations, LLC, CCBCC, Inc. CERTIFICATION OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Attachments: #1 Date Stamped State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(McCallum, Darryl)
February 15, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Ellen L. Hollander. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Arundel County, case number C-02-CV-19-000055. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7844216), filed by CCBCC, Inc., CCBCC Operations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Summons, #3 Exhibit 2 - Complaint, #4 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of Service, #5 Exhibit 4 - Summons, #6 Exhibit 5 - Affidavit of Service, #7 Exhibit 6 - State Court Docket, #8 Exhibit 7 - Summons, #9 Exhibit 8 - Summons, #10 Exhibit 9 - Affidavit of Service, #11 Exhibit 10 - Affidavit of Service, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(McCallum, Darryl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. The Coca-Cola Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Coca-Cola Company
Represented By: Darryl G McCallum
Represented By: Brent Lawrence Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coca-Cola Refreshments, USA, Inc.
Represented By: Darryl G McCallum
Represented By: Brent Lawrence Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCBCC Operations, LLC
Represented By: Darryl G McCallum
Represented By: Brent Lawrence Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCBCC, Inc.
Represented By: Darryl G McCallum
Represented By: Brent Lawrence Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnell Jones
Represented By: John Justin Leppler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?