Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore v. Monsanto Company et al

Plaintiff: Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore
Defendant: Solutia Inc., Monsanto Company and Pharmacia Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00483
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Filing 35 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #28 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kim Kocher. Directing attorney Kim Kocher to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 4/18/2019. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
April 18, 2019 Filing 34 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Thomas M. Goutman. Directing attorney Thomas M. Goutman to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 4/18/2019. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
April 15, 2019 Filing 33 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Solutia Inc. (Ismail, Kamil)
April 15, 2019 Filing 32 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Pharmacia Corporation (Ismail, Kamil)
April 15, 2019 Filing 31 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company (Ismail, Kamil)
April 15, 2019 Filing 30 Request for Hearing (Ismail, Kamil)
April 15, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Monsanto Company, Pharmacia Corporation, Solutia Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Ismail, Kamil)
April 15, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kim Kocher, Esquire (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7953033.) by Monsanto Company, Pharmacia Corporation, Solutia Inc.(Ismail, Kamil)
April 15, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Thomas M. Goutman, Esquire (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7952999.) by Monsanto Company, Pharmacia Corporation, Solutia Inc.(Ismail, Kamil)
April 15, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Kamil Ismail on behalf of All Defendants (Ismail, Kamil)
March 22, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard S Gordon on behalf of Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore (Gordon, Richard)
March 22, 2019 Filing 24 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Viola Vetter. Directing attorney Viola Vetter to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/22/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
March 20, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Viola Vetter (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7903030.) by Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore(Wolf, Martin)
March 19, 2019 Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Scott Summy. Directing attorney Scott Summy to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/19/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
March 19, 2019 Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of John P Fiske. Directing attorney John P Fiske to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/19/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
March 18, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Scott Summy (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7897902.) by Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore(Wolf, Martin)
March 18, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John P. Fiske (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7897872.) by Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore(Wolf, Martin)
March 18, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Ericka L Downie on behalf of Monsanto Company, Pharmacia Corporation, Solutia Inc. (Downie, Ericka)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply until and including April 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 3/18/2019.
March 18, 2019 Filing 16 QC NOTICE: #14 Notice of Appearance filed by Pharmacia Corporation, Monsanto Company, Solutia Inc. was filed incorrectly. *****Each attorney must file their Notice of Appearance using their CM/ECF login in order to be added as counsel to a case. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
March 15, 2019 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint,, by Monsanto Company, Pharmacia Corporation, Solutia Inc..(Cullen, Thomas)
March 15, 2019 Filing 14 FILED IN ERROR - NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Joseph Cullen, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Cullen, Thomas) Modified on 3/18/2019 (jnls, Deputy Clerk).
March 15, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Joseph Cullen, Jr on behalf of Monsanto Company, Pharmacia Corporation, Solutia Inc. (Cullen, Thomas)
March 7, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore. All Defendants.(Wolf, Martin)
February 22, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued 21 days as to Monsanto Company, Pharmacia Corporation, Solutia Inc. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore Summons Solutia Inc. (Wolf, Martin)
February 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore Summons Pharmacia Corportion (Wolf, Martin)
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore re #1 Complaint,, Summons Monsanto Company (Wolf, Martin)
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint,, filed by Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Summons. To correct this problem, file Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Summons to #1 . (ds3, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kyle J McGee. Directing attorney Kyle J McGee to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 2/21/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kyle J. McGee (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7847797.) by Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore(Wolf, Martin)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Andre M Davis on behalf of Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore (Davis, Andre)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne Sangree on behalf of Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore (Sangree, Suzanne)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ryan Martinez on behalf of Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore (Martinez, Elizabeth)
February 19, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard D. Bennett. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7846771.), filed by Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit)(Wolf, Martin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore v. Monsanto Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solutia Inc.
Represented By: Kamil Ismail
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Cullen, Jr
Represented By: Thomas M. Goutman
Represented By: Ericka L Downie
Represented By: Kim Kocher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Kamil Ismail
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Cullen, Jr
Represented By: Thomas M. Goutman
Represented By: Ericka L Downie
Represented By: Kim Kocher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia Corporation
Represented By: Kamil Ismail
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Cullen, Jr
Represented By: Thomas M. Goutman
Represented By: Ericka L Downie
Represented By: Kim Kocher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore
Represented By: Elizabeth Ryan Martinez
Represented By: Martin Eugene Wolf
Represented By: Andre M Davis
Represented By: Suzanne Sangree
Represented By: Kyle J McGee
Represented By: Scott Summy
Represented By: Richard S Gordon
Represented By: John P Fiske
Represented By: Viola Vetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?