Richardson v. American Lighting and Signalization

Plaintiff: Larry Richardson
Defendant: American Lighting and Signalization
Case Number: 1:2019cv00539
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah K Chasanow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981cv
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Filing 11 PAPERLESS NOTICE to Plaintiff: In your letter of April 14, 2019, you "request an extension on the Answer." There is no requirement under the federal rules for a plaintiff to respond to an Answer. Counsel for Defendant has provided a description of the efforts to provide you with a paper and electronic copy of the Answer. Out of an abundance of caution, the Clerk will mail you a copy of the Answer. (c/m to Plaintiff 4/18/19 with a copy of the Answer filed at ECF No. 6). (sat, Chambers)
April 17, 2019 Filing 10 Correspondence re: Responding to Mr. Richardson's Letter re Lack of Service (Attachments: #1 April 8, 2019 email)(Bolmarcich, Christina)
April 17, 2019 Filing 9 Correspondence from Plaintiff Larry Richardson re: Lack of Receipt of Copy of Answer (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (tds, Deputy Clerk)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery closes and a status report is due by 8/22/2019; the summary judgment motion deadline is 9/23/19 (c/m to Plaintiff 4/9/19 sat). Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 4/9/2019. (sat, Chambers)
March 26, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by American Lighting and Signalization identifying Corporate Parent UtiliCon Solutions, LLC, Corporate Parent Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC, Other Affiliate ALS of North Carolina, LLC for American Lighting and Signalization.(Bolmarcich, Christina)
March 26, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by American Lighting and Signalization. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bolmarcich, Christina)
March 14, 2019 Filing 5 Correspondence from Larry Richardson Requesting a Jury Trial Demand. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
March 7, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Richardson. American Lighting and Signalization served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to American Lighting and Signalization.(c/m to plaintiff on 2/25/2019 heps, Deputy Clerk)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing the Clerk to issue summons and to return the issued summons to plaintiff to effectuate service. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 2/25/2019. (c/m as directed 2/25/2019 heps, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Lighting and Signalization ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637113064) filed by Larry Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. American Lighting and Signalization
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Lighting and Signalization
Represented By: Christina Bolmarcich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?