Benson et al v. Auto Showcase of Bel Air, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Beatriz Gomez and Nicole Benson
Defendant: Keith Bagwell, Auto Showcase of Bel Air, Inc. and Belair Auto Showcase
Case Number: 1:2019cv00558
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: J Mark Coulson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 4/11/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
March 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson. Auto Showcase of Bel Air, Inc., Keith Bagwell, Belair Auto Showcase or counsel for Auto Showcase of Bel Air, Inc., Keith Bagwell, Belair Auto Showcase are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 4/9/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
March 25, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Auto Showcase of Bel Air, Inc., Keith Bagwell, Belair Auto Showcase.(Rauch, Lee)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Auto Showcase of Bel Air, Inc., Keith Bagwell, Belair Auto Showcase.(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 2/26/2019. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson. Nicole Benson, Beatriz Gomez or counsel for Nicole Benson, Beatriz Gomez are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 3/12/2019. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Auto Showcase of Bel Air, Inc., Keith Bagwell, Belair Auto Showcase ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7851743.), filed by Nicole Benson, Beatriz Gomez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Casper, Ari)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benson et al v. Auto Showcase of Bel Air, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Bagwell
Represented By: Lee Bryan Rauch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto Showcase of Bel Air, Inc.
Represented By: Lee Bryan Rauch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belair Auto Showcase
Represented By: Lee Bryan Rauch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beatriz Gomez
Represented By: Ari Scott Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Benson
Represented By: Ari Scott Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?