Doran et al v. Smith and Nephew, Inc.

Plaintiff: Dennis Doran and JoAnn Doran
Defendant: Smith and Nephew, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00561
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No. 13. Show Cause Process to Address Cases in Which Plaintiff Fails to Serve Substantially Complete Plaintiff Fact Sheet. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 4/18/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 18, 2019 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM to Counsel Confirming the results of the telephone conference held today. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 4/18/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 15, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
April 14, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/10/19, before Judge Blake. Court Reporter/Transcriber Douglas J. Zweizig, RDR, CRR, Telephone number 410-962-4474 / douglas_zweizig@mdd.uscourts.gov. Total number of pages filed: 47. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/6/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/15/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/15/2019.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(dz, Court Reporter)
April 10, 2019 Filing 26 Consent MOTION for Other Relief for Entry of Case Management Order No. 13 Concerning Show Cause Process to Address Cases in Which Plaintiff Fails to Serve a Substantially Complete Plaintiff Fact Sheet by Smith & Nephew, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
April 9, 2019 Filing 25 Supplemental to (1503 in 1:17-md-02775-CCB) Status Report filed by Smith & Nephew, Inc. Exhibit 1 to Parties' Proposed Agenda for April 10, 2019 Discovery Call and Status Update on Depositions and Case-Specific Discovery Process Discussions Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
April 8, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
April 5, 2019 Filing 23 STATUS REPORT Parties' Proposed Agenda for April 10, 2019 Discovery Call and Status Update on Depositions and Case-Specific Discovery Process Discussions by Smith & Nephew, Inc.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
April 5, 2019 Filing 22 -SEALED-RESPONSE in Opposition re (1475 in 1:17-md-02775-CCB) MOTION to Compel Discovery filed Ex Parte filed by Smith & Nephew, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Errata E, #6 Exhibit F)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
April 5, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to File Unredacted Opposition to Plaintiffs' Letter Motion to Compel Production of Discovery Ex Parte by Smith & Nephew, Inc.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
April 5, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re (1475 in 1:17-md-02775-CCB) MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Smith & Nephew, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
April 5, 2019 Filing 19 COMPLAINT (Short Form Complaint) against Smith & Nephew Inc., filed by Alvin Brown, Dallas Susan Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Palmer, Gregory)
April 5, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Other Relief Entry of Federal and State Coordination Order by Smith & Nephew Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Reiskin, Terri)
April 2, 2019 Filing 17 MDL Certified Transfer Order Transferring the listed case to the District of Maryland. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 1, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
April 1, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/27/19, before Judge Blake. Court Reporter/Transcriber Douglas J. Zweizig, Telephone number 410-962-4474. Total number of pages filed: 46. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/22/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/2/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/1/2019.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(dz, Court Reporter)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Confirming results of the status conference held on March 27, 2019. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 3/27/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
March 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
March 22, 2019 Filing 12 STATUS REPORT Parties' Proposed Agenda for March 27, 2019 Status Conference by Smith & Nephew, Inc.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
March 22, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Compel Discovery by In re: Smith & Nephew Birmingham Hip Resurfacing (BHR) Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Jenner, Robert)
March 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. re (1173 in 1:17-md-02775-CCB) MOTION to Dismiss THA and R3 Master Amended Consolidated Complaints and Short Form Complaints of Supplemental Authority in Support (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Markland v. Insys Therapeutics))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
March 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
March 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 Status Report Submitted in Response to Dkt. No. 1438 by Smith & Nephew Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -Letter from S&N to Plaintiffs 2-18-19)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Reiskin, Terri)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 DEFICIENCY NOTICE - Pursuant to Case Management Orders, please file the Short Form Complaint regarding this case in 17-md-2775. When prompted if you would like to spread the text, please answer no, as the complaint has already been filed in the individual case (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Smith and Nephew, Inc.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
February 22, 2019 Cases associated: Create association to 1:17-md-02775-CCB. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
February 22, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Catherine C. Blake. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J Preuss on behalf of Dennis Doran, JoAnn Doran (Preuss, Thomas)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Smith and Nephew, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7852592.), filed by Dennis Doran, JoAnn Doran. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Preuss, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doran et al v. Smith and Nephew, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Doran
Represented By: Thomas J Preuss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JoAnn Doran
Represented By: Thomas J Preuss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith and Nephew, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?