Phillips v. University of Maryland Baltimore County et al

Plaintiff: Monisha Phillips
Defendant: University of Maryland Baltimore County, Erik J. DelFosse and Dave Gleason
Case Number: 1:2019cv00570
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing the Plaintiff to submit completed summons to the Clerk and the Clerk SHALL prepare and issue summons and to return summons to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 4/10/2019. (c/m 4/11/19 bas, Deputy Clerk)
April 5, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 14637114122 (bas, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 4/10/2019 (bas, Deputy Clerk).
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Granting plaintiff 21 days to pay the full civil filing fee of $400. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 3/18/2019. (c/m 3/18/19 bas, Deputy Clerk)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Monisha Phillips(bas, Deputy Clerk)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Erik J. DelFosse, Dave Gleason, University of Maryland Baltimore County, filed by Monisha Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(bas, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. University of Maryland Baltimore County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Maryland Baltimore County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik J. DelFosse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Gleason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monisha Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?