J&N Publishing, LLC et al v. 3508 Eastern, LLC et al

Plaintiff: J&N Publishing, LLC and Premium Latin Publishing Inc.
Defendant: Carlos Cruz, Ivan R Brown and 3508 Eastern, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00582
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:411
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Premium Latin Publishing Inc., J&N Publishing, LLC. Ivan R Brown served on 3/2/2019, answer due 3/25/2019.(Mitchell, Heather)
March 27, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Premium Latin Publishing Inc., J&N Publishing, LLC. Carlos Cruz served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019.(Mitchell, Heather)
March 27, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Premium Latin Publishing Inc., J&N Publishing, LLC. 3508 Eastern, LLC served on 3/2/2019, answer due 3/25/2019.(Mitchell, Heather)
March 27, 2019 Filing 8 QC NOTICE: 5] Affidavit of Service filed by J&N Publishing, LLC, Premium Latin Publishing Inc., #6 Affidavit of Service filed by J&N Publishing, LLC, Premium Latin Publishing Inc., [ #7 Affidavit of Service filed by J&N Publishing, LLC, Premium Latin Publishing Inc. was filed incorrectly. **Incorrect event was selected. Please refile using the event under Service of Process: Summons Returned Executed. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
March 26, 2019 Filing 7 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons and Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure served on Ivan Brown on 03/02/2019, filed by J&N Publishing, LLC, Premium Latin Publishing Inc..(Mitchell, Heather) Modified on 3/27/2019 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
March 26, 2019 Filing 6 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons and Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure served on Carlos Cruz on 03/08/2019, filed by J&N Publishing, LLC, Premium Latin Publishing Inc..(Mitchell, Heather) Modified on 3/27/2019 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
March 26, 2019 Filing 5 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons and Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure served on 3508 Eastern LLC d/b/a Carlos O'Charlies on 03/02/2019, filed by J&N Publishing, LLC, Premium Latin Publishing Inc..(Mitchell, Heather) Modified on 3/27/2019 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 Correspondence sent to Register of Copyrights re: Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright (c/m 2/26/2019)(ko, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to 3508 Eastern, LLC, Ivan R Brown, Carlos Cruz.(ko, Deputy Clerk)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by J&N Publishing, LLC, Premium Latin Publishing Inc. (Mitchell, Heather)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 3508 Eastern, LLC, Ivan R Brown, Carlos Cruz ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7855559.), filed by Premium Latin Publishing Inc., J&N Publishing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Schedule A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Carlos Cruz, #4 Summons Ivan R. Brown, #5 Summons Resident Agent, Ivan R. Brown)(Mitchell, Heather)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J&N Publishing, LLC et al v. 3508 Eastern, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivan R Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3508 Eastern, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J&N Publishing, LLC
Represented By: Linda J Zirkelbach
Represented By: Heather Louise Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Premium Latin Publishing Inc.
Represented By: Linda J Zirkelbach
Represented By: Heather Louise Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?