Brittney Gobble Photography, LLC v. Sinclair Portland Licensee, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Brittney Gobble Photography, LLC
Defendant: KEYE Licensee, LLC, WSET Licensee, LLC, KUTV Licensee, LLC, KTVL Licensee, LLC, KTUL Licensee, LLC, WPBN Licensee, LLC, KGBT Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Lewiston Licensee, LLC, WPDE Licensee, LLC, WLUK Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Portland Licensee, LLC, WTOV Licensee, LLC, WGXA Licensee, LLC, WJAR Licensee, LLC, WOAI Licensee, LLC, KVII Licensee, LLC, WTVC Licensee, LCC, WACH Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Boise Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Yakima Licensee, LLC, KATV Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Bakersfield Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Radio of Seattle Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Eugene Licensee, LLC, WNWO Licensee, LLC, WSTQ Licensee, LLC, WKRC Licensee, LLC, KHQA Licensee, LLC, Gray Television Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Seattle Licensee, LLC, KRCG Licensee, LLC, WFXL Licensee, LLC, KTVO Licensee, LLC and WZTV Licensee, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00606
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 THIS IS A CONSOLIDATED CASE. PLEASE DO NOT ELECTRONICALLY FILE OR SPREAD TEXT IN THIS CASE. ALL SUBSEQUENT PLEADINGS ARE TO BE ELECTRONICALLY FILED ONLY IN THE LEAD CASE (RDB-18-3403). (krs, Deputy Clerk)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Directing RDB-19-559 and RDB-19-606 are consolidated for all further proceedings with RDB-18-3384 and RDB-18-3403; RDB-18-3403 is designated as lead case. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 3/12/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2019 Filing 21 Correspondence to Counsel re: Transfer Notification Letter (c/em) (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2019 Filing 20 (FILED IN ERROR) Correspondence to Counsel re: Transfer Notification Letter (c/em) (hmls, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 2/26/2019 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
February 26, 2019 Filing 19 Case transferred in from District of Nevada; Case Number 2:18-cv-02096. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Stipulation to Transfer Case. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 20, 2019 Filing 17 Joint STIPULATION to Transfer Case to the U.S. District Court of Maryland and Proposed Order by Defendants Gray Television Licensee, LLC, KATV Licensee, LLC, KEYE Licensee, LLC, KGBT Licensee, LLC, KHQA Licensee, LLC, KRCG Licensee, LLC, KTUL Licensee, LLC, KTVL Licensee, LLC, KTVO Licensee, LLC, KUTV Licensee, LLC, KVII Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Bakersfield Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Boise Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Eugene Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Lewiston Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Portland Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Radio Of Seattle Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Seattle Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Yakima Licensee, LLC, WACH Licensee, LLC, WFXL Licensee, LLC, WGXA Licensee, LLC, WJAR Licensee, LLC, WKRC Licensee, LLC, WLUK Licensee, LLC, WNWO Licensee, LLC, WOAI Licensee, LLC, WPBN Licensee, LLC, WPDE Licensee, LLC, WSET Licensee, LLC, WSTQ Licensee, LLC, WTOV Licensee, LLC, WTVC Licensee, LCC, WZTV Licensee, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USDC-MD - Order Consolidating Cases) (Fears, Chad)
February 20, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Gray Television Licensee, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent WVLT-TV, Inc., Corporate Parent Gray Television Group, Inc. for Gray Television Licensee, LLC added. (Fears, Chad)
February 20, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,, filed by Gray Television Licensee, LLC.(Fears, Chad)
February 8, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brittney Gobble Photography, LLC re #3 Summons Issued,,, #2 Complaint,,,,,,. Gray Television Licensee, LLC served on 1/30/2019, answer due 2/20/2019. (Hofland, Bradley)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andrew K. O'Connell and approving Designation of Local Counsel Chad R. Fears for defendants KATV Licensee, LLC, KEYE Licensee, LLC, KGBT Licensee, LLC, KHQA Licensee, LLC, KRCG Licensee, LLC, KTUL Licensee, LLC, KTVL Licensee, LLC, KTVO Licensee, LLC, KUTV Licensee, LLC, KVII Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Bakersfield Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Boise Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Eugene Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Lewiston Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Portland Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Radio Of Seattle Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Seattle Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Yakima Licensee, LLC, WACH Licensee, LLC, WFXL Licensee, LLC, WGXA Licensee, LLC, WJAR Licensee, LLC, WKRC Licensee, LLC, WLUK Licensee, LLC, WNWO Licensee, LLC, WOAI Licensee, LLC, WPBN Licensee, LLC, WPDE Licensee, LLC, WSET Licensee, LLC, WSTQ Licensee, LLC, WTOV Licensee, LLC, WTVC Licensee, LCC, WZTV Licensee, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/9/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 8, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Andrew K. O'Connell and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Chad R. Fears (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5386020) by Defendants KATV Licensee, LLC, KEYE Licensee, LLC, KGBT Licensee, LLC, KHQA Licensee, LLC, KRCG Licensee, LLC, KTUL Licensee, LLC, KTVL Licensee, LLC, KTVO Licensee, LLC, KUTV Licensee, LLC, KVII Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Bakersfield Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Boise Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Eugene Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Lewiston Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Portland Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Radio Of Seattle Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Seattle Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Yakima Licensee, LLC, WACH Licensee, LLC, WFXL Licensee, LLC, WGXA Licensee, LLC, WJAR Licensee, LLC, WKRC Licensee, LLC, WLUK Licensee, LLC, WNWO Licensee, LLC, WOAI Licensee, LLC, WPBN Licensee, LLC, WPDE Licensee, LLC, WSET Licensee, LLC, WSTQ Licensee, LLC, WTOV Licensee, LLC, WTVC Licensee, LCC, WZTV Licensee, LLC. (Fears, Chad)
January 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by KATV Licensee, LLC, KEYE Licensee, LLC, KGBT Licensee, LLC, KHQA Licensee, LLC, KRCG Licensee, LLC, KTUL Licensee, LLC, KTVL Licensee, LLC, KTVO Licensee, LLC, KUTV Licensee, LLC, KVII Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Bakersfield Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Boise Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Eugene Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Lewiston Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Portland Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Radio Of Seattle Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Seattle Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Yakima Licensee, LLC, WACH Licensee, LLC, WFXL Licensee, LLC, WGXA Licensee, LLC, WJAR Licensee, LLC, WKRC Licensee, LLC, WLUK Licensee, LLC, WNWO Licensee, LLC, WOAI Licensee, LLC, WPBN Licensee, LLC, WPDE Licensee, LLC, WSET Licensee, LLC, WSTQ Licensee, LLC, WTOV Licensee, LLC, WTVC Licensee, LCC, WZTV Licensee, LLC. (Fears, Chad)
January 8, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,, filed by KATV Licensee, LLC, KEYE Licensee, LLC, KGBT Licensee, LLC, KHQA Licensee, LLC, KRCG Licensee, LLC, KTUL Licensee, LLC, KTVL Licensee, LLC, KTVO Licensee, LLC, KUTV Licensee, LLC, KVII Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Bakersfield Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Boise Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Eugene Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Lewiston Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Portland Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Radio Of Seattle Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Seattle Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Yakima Licensee, LLC, WACH Licensee, LLC, WFXL Licensee, LLC, WGXA Licensee, LLC, WJAR Licensee, LLC, WKRC Licensee, LLC, WLUK Licensee, LLC, WNWO Licensee, LLC, WOAI Licensee, LLC, WPBN Licensee, LLC, WPDE Licensee, LLC, WSET Licensee, LLC, WSTQ Licensee, LLC, WTOV Licensee, LLC, WTVC Licensee, LCC, WZTV Licensee, LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 2/22/2019.(Fears, Chad) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
January 3, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brittney Gobble Photography, LLC re #3 Summons Issued,,, #2 Complaint,,,,,,. KATV Licensee, LLC served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019; KEYE Licensee, LLC served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019; KGBT Licensee, LLC served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019; KHQA Licensee, LLC served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019; KRCG Licensee, LLC served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019; KTUL Licensee, LLC served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019; KTVL Licensee, LLC served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019; KTVO Licensee, LLC served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019; KUTV Licensee, LLC served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019; KVII Licensee, LLC served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019; Sinclair Bakersfield Licensee, LLC served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019; Sinclair Boise Licensee, LLC served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019; Sinclair Eugene Licensee, LLC served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019; Sinclair Lewiston Licensee, LLC served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019; Sinclair Portland Licensee, LLC served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019; Sinclair Radio Of Seattle Licensee, LLC served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019; Sinclair Seattle Licensee, LLC served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019; Sinclair Yakima Licensee, LLC served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019; WACH Licensee, LLC served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019; WFXL Licensee, LLC served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019; WGXA Licensee, LLC served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019; WJAR Licensee, LLC served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019; WKRC Licensee, LLC served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019; WLUK Licensee, LLC served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019; WNWO Licensee, LLC served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019; WOAI Licensee, LLC served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019; WPBN Licensee, LLC served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019; WPDE Licensee, LLC served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019; WSET Licensee, LLC served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019; WSTQ Licensee, LLC served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019; WTOV Licensee, LLC served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019; WTVC Licensee, LCC served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019; WZTV Licensee, LLC served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019. (Hofland, Bradley)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney C. Dale Quisenberry and approving Designation of Local Counsel Bradley Hofland. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/20/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by C. Dale Quisenberry and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Bradley J. Hofland (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5364865) by Plaintiff Brittney Gobble Photography, LLC. (Hofland, Bradley)
November 5, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Brittney Gobble Photography, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Hofland, Bradley)
November 2, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel C. Dale Quisenberry and John T. Polasek to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 12/17/2018. (no image attached) (MMM)
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25 part 1, #28 Exhibit 25 part 2, #29 Exhibit 26, #30 Exhibit 27, #31 Exhibit 28, #32 Exhibit 29, #33 Exhibit 30, #34 Exhibit 31, #35 Exhibit 32, #36 Exhibit 33, #37 Exhibit 34, #38 Exhibit 35, #39 Exhibit 36, #40 Exhibit 37, #41 Exhibit 38, #42 Exhibit 39, #43 Exhibit 40, #44 Exhibit 41, #45 Exhibit 42, #46 Exhibit 43, #47 Exhibit 44, #48 Exhibit 45, #49 Exhibit 46, #50 Exhibit 47, #51 Exhibit 48, #52 Exhibit 49, #53 Exhibit 50, #54 Exhibit 51, #55 Exhibit 52, #56 Exhibit 53, #57 Exhibit 54, #58 Exhibit 55, #59 Exhibit 56) (MMM)
November 2, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Gray Television Licensee, LLC, KATV Licensee, LLC, KEYE Licensee, LLC, KGBT Licensee, LLC, KHQA Licensee, LLC, KRCG Licensee, LLC, KTUL Licensee, LLC, KTVL Licensee, LLC, KTVO Licensee, LLC, KUTV Licensee, LLC, KVII Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Bakersfield Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Boise Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Eugene Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Lewiston Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Portland Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Radio Of Seattle Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Seattle Licensee, LLC, Sinclair Yakima Licensee, LLC, WACH Licensee, LLC, WFXL Licensee, LLC, WGXA Licensee, LLC, WJAR Licensee, LLC, WKRC Licensee, LLC, WLUK Licensee, LLC, WNWO Licensee, LLC, WOAI Licensee, LLC, WPBN Licensee, LLC, WPDE Licensee, LLC, WSET Licensee, LLC, WSTQ Licensee, LLC, WTOV Licensee, LLC, WTVC Licensee, LCC, WZTV Licensee, LLC re #2 Complaint. (MMM)
November 1, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (MMM)
November 1, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5306660) by Brittney Gobble Photography, LLC. Proof of service due by 1/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25-1, #27 Exhibit 25-2, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32, #35 Exhibit 33, #36 Exhibit 34, #37 Exhibit 35, #38 Exhibit 36, #39 Exhibit 37, #40 Exhibit 38, #41 Exhibit 39, #42 Exhibit 40, #43 Exhibit 41, #44 Exhibit 42, #45 Exhibit 43, #46 Exhibit 44, #47 Exhibit 45, #48 Exhibit 46, #49 Exhibit 47, #50 Exhibit 48, #51 Exhibit 49, #52 Exhibit 50, #53 Exhibit 51, #54 Exhibit 52, #55 Exhibit 53, #56 Exhibit 54, #57 Exhibit 55, #58 Exhibit 56)(Hofland, Bradley) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Brittney Gobble Photography, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons, #25 Summons, #26 Summons, #27 Summons, #28 Summons, #29 Summons, #30 Summons, #31 Summons, #32 Summons, #33 Summons)(Hofland, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brittney Gobble Photography, LLC v. Sinclair Portland Licensee, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEYE Licensee, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Kevin O Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WSET Licensee, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Kevin O Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KUTV Licensee, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Kevin O Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KTVL Licensee, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Kevin O Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KTUL Licensee, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Kevin O Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WPBN Licensee, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Kevin O Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KGBT Licensee, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Kevin O Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sinclair Lewiston Licensee, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Kevin O Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WPDE Licensee, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Kevin O Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WLUK Licensee, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Kevin O Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sinclair Portland Licensee, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Kevin O Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WTOV Licensee, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Kevin O Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WGXA Licensee, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Kevin O Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WJAR Licensee, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Kevin O Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WOAI Licensee, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Kevin O Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KVII Licensee, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Kevin O Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WTVC Licensee, LCC
Represented By: Andrew Kevin O Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WACH Licensee, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Kevin O Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sinclair Boise Licensee, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Kevin O Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sinclair Yakima Licensee, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Kevin O Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATV Licensee, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Kevin O Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sinclair Bakersfield Licensee, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Kevin O Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sinclair Radio of Seattle Licensee, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Kevin O Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sinclair Eugene Licensee, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Kevin O Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WNWO Licensee, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Kevin O Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WSTQ Licensee, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Kevin O Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WKRC Licensee, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Kevin O Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KHQA Licensee, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Kevin O Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gray Television Licensee, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Kevin O Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sinclair Seattle Licensee, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Kevin O Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KRCG Licensee, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Kevin O Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WFXL Licensee, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Kevin O Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KTVO Licensee, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Kevin O Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WZTV Licensee, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Kevin O Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittney Gobble Photography, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?