Byrd v. Smith & Nephew , Inc.
Plaintiff: Billy Byrd and Billy Byrd, Jr.
Defendant: Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00831
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
July 8, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 14 Discovery and Trial Pool Process for BHR and THA Track Cases. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 7/3/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
July 1, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
July 1, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/26/19, before Judge Blake. Court Reporter/Transcriber Douglas J. Zweizig, RDR, CRR, Telephone number 410-962-4474. Total number of pages filed: 62. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/22/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/1/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/30/2019.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(dz, Court Reporter)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Confirming the dates set at the June 26, 2019 status conference. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 6/26/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
June 24, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listigns of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
June 19, 2019 Filing 45 STATUS REPORT Parties' Proposed Agenda for June 26, 2019 Status Conference by Smith & Nephew Inc.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Reiskin, Terri)
June 17, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
June 17, 2019 Filing 43 REPLY to Response to Motion re (1521 in 1:17-md-02775-CCB) MOTION for Protective Order regarding Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Smith & Nephew, Inc. filed by Smith & Nephew Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Pltf First RFP, #2 Exhibit B-Pltf Amended 30b6, #3 Exhibit C-Pltf First Rog)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Reiskin, Terri)
June 11, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. re (1173 in 1:17-md-02775-CCB) MOTION to Dismiss THA and R3 Master Amended Consolidated Complaints and Short Form Complaints of Supplemental Authority in Support (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
June 10, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
June 10, 2019 Filing 40 -SEALED-RESPONSE in Opposition re (1521 in 1:17-md-02775-CCB) MOTION for Protective Order regarding Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Smith & Nephew, Inc. Supplemental Response filed by In re: Smith & Nephew Birmingham Hip Resurfacing (BHR) Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Jenner, Robert)
June 7, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/5/19, before Judge Blake. Court Reporter/Transcriber Douglas J. Zweizig, RDR, CRR, Telephone number 410-962-4474. Total number of pages filed: 68. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/28/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/8/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/5/2019.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(dz, Court Reporter)
June 3, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
May 31, 2019 Filing 37 STATUS REPORT by Smith & Nephew, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A ([Proposed] Case Management Order No. 14 [Defendant: BHR Track] Discovery and Trial Pool Process))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying 1204 1475 plaintiffs' Motions to Compel. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 5/31/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
May 31, 2019 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 5/31/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
May 28, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
May 24, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/22/19, before Judge Blake. Court Reporter/Transcriber Douglas J. Zweizig, RDR, CRR, Telephone number 410-962-4474. Total number of pages filed: 24. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/14/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/24/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/22/2019.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(dz, Court Reporter)
May 20, 2019 Filing 32 REPLY to Response to Motion re (1498 in 1:17-md-02775-CCB) MOTION for Other Relief Entry of Federal and State Coordination Order filed by Smith & Nephew Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Foery Discovery, #2 Exhibit B-Foery MTC, #3 Exhibit Scherher Discovery, #4 Exhibit Davis Email, #5 Exhibit Slone Aff)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Reiskin, Terri)
May 20, 2019 Filing 31 -SEALED-RESPONSE in Opposition re (1521 in 1:17-md-02775-CCB) MOTION for Protective Order regarding Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Smith & Nephew, Inc. filed by In re: Smith & Nephew Birmingham Hip Resurfacing (BHR) Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Jenner, Robert)
May 20, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
May 17, 2019 Filing 29 STATUS REPORT Parties' Proposed Agenda for May 22, 2019 Status Conference by Smith & Nephew, Inc.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
May 15, 2019 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM to Counsel re status of mediation. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 5/15/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
May 14, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re (1498 in 1:17-md-02775-CCB) MOTION for Other Relief Entry of Federal and State Coordination Order filed by Donna Didrikson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - S&N state court cases, #2 Exhibit Ex B - Proposed Draft letter to State Court Judges, #3 Exhibit Ec C - Taxotere Letter, #4 Exhibit Ex D - Biomet Letter, #5 Exhibit Ex E - Stryker Rejuvenate Letter)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Ward, Jasper)
May 13, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
May 7, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/2/19, before Judge Blake. Court Reporter/Transcriber Douglas J. Zweizig, RDR, CRR, Telephone number 410-962-4474 / douglas_zweizig@mdd.uscourts.gov. Total number of pages filed: 16. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/28/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/7/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/5/2019.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(dz, Court Reporter)
May 6, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Litings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Confirming the results of the status conference held on May 2, 2019; setting briefing schedules for certain motions. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 5/3/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 29, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
April 26, 2019 Filing 21 STATUS REPORT Parties' Proposed Agenda for May 2, 2019 Status Conference by Smith & Nephew, Inc.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
April 22, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No. 13. Show Cause Process to Address Cases in Which Plaintiff Fails to Serve Substantially Complete Plaintiff Fact Sheet. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 4/18/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 18, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM to Counsel Confirming the results of the telephone conference held today. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 4/18/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 15, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
April 14, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/10/19, before Judge Blake. Court Reporter/Transcriber Douglas J. Zweizig, RDR, CRR, Telephone number 410-962-4474 / douglas_zweizig@mdd.uscourts.gov. Total number of pages filed: 47. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/6/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/15/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/15/2019.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(dz, Court Reporter)
April 10, 2019 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Other Relief for Entry of Case Management Order No. 13 Concerning Show Cause Process to Address Cases in Which Plaintiff Fails to Serve a Substantially Complete Plaintiff Fact Sheet by Smith & Nephew, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
April 9, 2019 Filing 14 Supplemental to (1503 in 1:17-md-02775-CCB) Status Report filed by Smith & Nephew, Inc. Exhibit 1 to Parties' Proposed Agenda for April 10, 2019 Discovery Call and Status Update on Depositions and Case-Specific Discovery Process Discussions Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
April 8, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
April 5, 2019 Filing 12 STATUS REPORT Parties' Proposed Agenda for April 10, 2019 Discovery Call and Status Update on Depositions and Case-Specific Discovery Process Discussions by Smith & Nephew, Inc.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
April 5, 2019 Filing 11 -SEALED-RESPONSE in Opposition re (1475 in 1:17-md-02775-CCB) MOTION to Compel Discovery filed Ex Parte filed by Smith & Nephew, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Errata E, #6 Exhibit F)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
April 5, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to File Unredacted Opposition to Plaintiffs' Letter Motion to Compel Production of Discovery Ex Parte by Smith & Nephew, Inc.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
April 5, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re (1475 in 1:17-md-02775-CCB) MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Smith & Nephew, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
April 5, 2019 Filing 8 COMPLAINT (Short Form Complaint) against Smith & Nephew Inc., filed by Alvin Brown, Dallas Susan Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Palmer, Gregory)
April 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Other Relief Entry of Federal and State Coordination Order by Smith & Nephew Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Reiskin, Terri)
April 2, 2019 Filing 6 MDL Certified Transfer Order Transferring the listed case to the District of Maryland. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
April 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/27/19, before Judge Blake. Court Reporter/Transcriber Douglas J. Zweizig, Telephone number 410-962-4474. Total number of pages filed: 46. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/22/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/2/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/1/2019.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(dz, Court Reporter)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Confirming results of the status conference held on March 27, 2019. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 3/27/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
March 26, 2019 Filing 2 DEFICIENCY NOTICE - Pursuant to Case Management Orders, please file the Short Form Complaint regarding this case in 17-md-2775. When prompted if you would like to spread the text, please answer no, as the complaint has already been filed in the individual case (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
March 25, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Catherine C. Blake. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
March 25, 2019 Cases associated: Create association to 1:17-md-02775-CCB. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
March 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Smith & Nephew, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7911266.), filed by Billy Byrd. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Farnolo, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byrd v. Smith & Nephew , Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Byrd, Jr.
Represented By: Nicholas Farnolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?