J.J. McDonnell & Co., Inc. v. Friesland

Plaintiff: J.J. McDonnell & Co., Inc.
Defendant: Mr. Kurt Friesland and Kurt Friesland
Case Number: 1:2019cv00962
Filed: March 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Marginal ORDER APPROVING #9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by J.J. McDonnell & Co., Inc. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 4/4/2019. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
April 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by J.J. McDonnell & Co., Inc. (Miller, Kerstin)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER memorializing agreements reached during teleconference on pending motions; setting deadline for status report and follow-up teleconference; denying Plaintiff's #7 Corrected Motion to Shorten Time. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 4/3/2019. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
April 2, 2019 Telephone Conference re: scheduling/status held on 4/2/2019 before Judge George Levi Russell, III. (kmts, Deputy Clerk)
April 2, 2019 Filing 7 Corrected MOTION to Shorten Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Limited, Expedited Discovery by J.J. McDonnell & Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1)(Miller, Kerstin)
April 1, 2019 Filing 6 (FILED IN ERROR - Counsel will refile) MOTION to Shorten Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Limited, Expedited Discovery by J.J. McDonnell & Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Kerstin) Modified on 4/2/2019 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
April 1, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued 21 days as to Kurt Friesland.(ko, Deputy Clerk)
March 29, 2019 Filing 4 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by J.J. McDonnell & Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Kerstin)
March 29, 2019 Filing 3 Emergency MOTION for Discovery and to Preserve Evidence by J.J. McDonnell & Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Kerstin)
March 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by J.J. McDonnell & Co., Inc. re #1 Complaint, Summons (Miller, Kerstin)
March 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kurt Friesland ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7923287.), filed by J.J. McDonnell & Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miller, Kerstin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J.J. McDonnell & Co., Inc. v. Friesland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.J. McDonnell & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Douglas William Desmarais
Represented By: Kerstin Marie Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Kurt Friesland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt Friesland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?