Grainger v. Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Estelle C. Grainger
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC and C.T. Corporation System
Case Number: 1:2019cv01067
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Estelle C. Grainger. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Exhibit IX, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit) (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
June 12, 2019 Filing 12 Rule 12/56 letter mailed to Estelle C. Grainger (krs, Deputy Clerk)
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 QC NOTICE: #9 Response filed by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC was filed incorrectly. **In the future, DO NOT SPREAD entries into other cases (GLR-18-cv-2530). No further action required. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Glass, Daniel)
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE re (6 in 1:19-cv-01067-GLR) Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC.Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01067-GLR, 1:18-cv-02530-GLR(Glass, Daniel)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER setting deadline for Defendant Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC to respond to #6 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 6/4/2019. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
April 17, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Estelle C. Grainger (krs, Deputy Clerk)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 4/10/2019. (c/m 4/10/19) (krs, Deputy Clerk)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 Removal Notification Letter mailed to Plaintiff (c/m 4/10/19) (krs, Deputy Clerk)
April 10, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge George Levi Russell, III. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
April 9, 2019 Filing 5 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (4) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE COUNTY. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
April 9, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against C.T. Corporation System, Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, filed by Estelle C. Grainger.(krs, Deputy Clerk)
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Carrington Holding Company, LLC, Corporate Parent The Carrington Companies, LLC, Corporate Parent Carrington Investment Partners, L.P., Corporate Parent Carrington Capital Management, LLC for Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC.(Glass, Daniel)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore County, case number C-03-CV-19-000405. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7942483), filed by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Glass, Daniel) Modified on 4/10/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grainger v. Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC
Represented By: Daniel A Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.T. Corporation System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estelle C. Grainger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?