Lassiter v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Claudis Lassiter
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv01069
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MARGINAL ORDER Approving #8 Status Report Submitted filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 6/27/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 Status Report Submitted by United States of America (Gould, Ilissa)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 MOTION for Return of Property. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 5/28/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 MOTION for Return of Property by United States of America(Gould, Ilissa)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 MOTION for Return of Property. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 4/23/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
April 23, 2019 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 MOTION for Return of Property, #2 Order by United States of America(Gould, Ilissa)
April 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Ilissa M Gould on behalf of United States of America (Gould, Ilissa)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MARGINAL ORDER Directing USA to respond by 4/25/2019 re #1 MOTION for Return of Property filed by Claudis Lassiter. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 4/9/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Return of Property by Claudis Lassiter (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Property List, #2 Exhibit Letter re Property) (jnls, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lassiter v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudis Lassiter
Represented By: C Justin Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Christine Oi jyn Goo
Represented By: Ilissa M Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?