State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Himes et al

Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Defendant: Thomas Eugene Himes and Janice Himes
Case Number: 1:2019cv01090
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MARGINAL ORDER Granting #8 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 7/1/2019. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, STIPULATION of Dismissal by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(Stravitz, Eric)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Stravitz, Eric)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lawrence F. Walker (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8081266.) by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(Stravitz, Eric)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Thomas Eugene Himes served on 5/6/2019, answer due 5/28/2019.(Stravitz, Eric)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Janice Himes served on 5/6/2019, answer due 5/28/2019.(Stravitz, Eric)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Janice Himes, Thomas Eugene Himes.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
April 11, 2019 Jury Trial Demand by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(bas, Deputy Clerk)
April 11, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard D. Bennett. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Corporate Parent State Farm Group for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Stravitz, Eric)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Janice Himes, Thomas Eugene Himes ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7945300.), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Stravitz, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Himes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Eric N Stravitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Eugene Himes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Himes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?