Tombs v. Board of Education et al

Plaintiff: Charlene Tombs
Defendant: Baltimore County Public School, April Franklin, Frances Allen, Southwest Academy Middle School, Roger Pluckett, Amy Maloney, Glen Galante, Natalie McGlone, John Mayo, Assata Peterson, Dr. Frances Allen and Board of Education
Case Number: 1:2019cv01247
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: James K Bredar
Referring Judge: Beth P Gesner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12111
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER directing the Clerk to close the case. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 6/20/2019. (c/m 6/20/19)(krs, Deputy Clerk)
June 19, 2019 Case reassigned to Chief Judge James K. Bredar. Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner no longer assigned to the case. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
June 19, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Charlene Tombs (krs, Deputy Clerk)
June 14, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed Frances Allen served on 6/5/2019, answer due 6/26/2019; Board of Education served on 6/5/2019, answer due 6/26/2019.(krs, Deputy Clerk)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DENYING #14 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 6/10/2019. (c/m) (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
June 4, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Charlene Tombs.(hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 31, 2019 Filing 12 Supplemental to #7 Amended Complaint filed by Charlene Tombs (krs, Deputy Clerk)
May 31, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued 21 days as to Frances Allen, Board of Education. (Attachments: #1 USM forms)(krs, Deputy Clerk)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 5/31/2019. (c/m 5/31/19) (krs, Deputy Clerk)
May 31, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner. Charlene Tombs or counsel for Charlene Tombs are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 6/14/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 Supplemental to #7 Amended Complaint filed by Charlene Tombs (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 USM form for Defendant Frances Allen)(krs, Deputy Clerk)
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dr. Frances Allen, Board of Education filed by Charlene Tombs. (Attachments: #1 Summons/285 Forms)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 5/21/2019 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 Correspondence to Judge by Charlene Tombs. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 Correspondence to Judge by Charlene Tombs. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of filing proposed summonses and USM forms by Charlene Tombs (Attachments: #1 USM forms)(krs, Deputy Clerk)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting plaintiff 21 days to provide ten service copies of the Complaint, six additional summons, and ten completed Marshal forms and return them to the Clerk. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 5/6/2019. (c/m and forms 5/7/19) (krs, Deputy Clerk)
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charlene Tombs(krs, Deputy Clerk)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Frances Allen, Baltimore County Public School, April Franklin, Glen Galante, Amy Maloney, John Mayo, Natalie McGlone, Assata Peterson, Roger Pluckett, Southwest Academy Middle School, filed by Charlene Tombs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(krs, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tombs v. Board of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baltimore County Public School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: April Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frances Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Academy Middle School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Pluckett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glen Galante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natalie McGlone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assata Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Frances Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlene Tombs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?