Plum Dragon Herbs, Inc. v. Brackin Wholesale Coatings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Plum Dragon Herbs, Inc.
Defendant: Nova Molecular Technologies, Inc. and Brackin Wholesale Coatings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01251
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite for Settlement. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 6/25/2019. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 3/2/2020. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 6/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Memorandum to Counsel Concerning Discovery)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
June 24, 2019 Telephone Status Conference held on 6/24/2019 before Judge Ellen L. Hollander. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re: Telephone conference on Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 6/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Draft Scheduling Order)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
May 21, 2019 Filing 25 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Nova Molecular Technologies, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Nova Molecular Technologies, Inc., Other Affiliate AIG Specialty Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Nova Molecular Sumter, LLC, Other Affiliate AVON, LLC, Other Affiliate ChemDirect, Inc. for Nova Molecular Technologies, Inc..(Hanrahan, Catherine)
May 20, 2019 Filing 24 QC NOTICE: #23 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Nova Molecular Technologies, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **The Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement needs to be refiled and the corporate parent and/or affiliations need to be entered when the system prompts you. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
May 17, 2019 Filing 23 (FILED IN ERROR) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Nova Molecular Technologies, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Nova Molecular Technologies, Inc. for Nova Molecular Technologies, Inc..(Hanrahan, Catherine) Modified on 5/20/2019 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
May 17, 2019 Filing 22 QC NOTICE: #18 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Nova Molecular Technologies, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **The Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement needs to be refiled and the corporate parent and/or affiliations need to be entered when the system prompts you. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying #14 Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default against Defendant Brackin Wholesale Coatings, Inc. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 5/17/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
May 17, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense filed by Brackin Wholesale Coatings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ignozzi, Marie)
May 17, 2019 Filing 19 Correspondence re: Consent to Removal (Hanrahan, Catherine)
May 17, 2019 Filing 18 (FILED IN ERROR) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Nova Molecular Technologies, Inc. (Hanrahan, Catherine) Modified on 5/17/2019 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
May 17, 2019 Filing 17 Jury Trial Demand by Nova Molecular Technologies, Inc.(Hanrahan, Catherine)
May 17, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Nova Molecular Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet to Answer)(Hanrahan, Catherine)
May 16, 2019 Filing 15 Defendant Brackin Wholesale Coatings' ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Brackin Wholesale Coatings, Inc..(Ignozzi, Marie)
May 16, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense by Plum Dragon Herbs, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Conti, Anthony)
May 13, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE re #8 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Brackin Wholesale Coatings, Inc..(Ignozzi, Marie)
May 7, 2019 Filing 12 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Brackin Wholesale Coatings, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate United Fire Group Insurance for Brackin Wholesale Coatings, Inc..(Ignozzi, Marie)
May 2, 2019 Filing 11 QC NOTICE: #10 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Brackin Wholesale Coatings, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **The Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement needs to be refiled and the corporate parent and/or affiliations need to be entered when the system prompts you. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
May 2, 2019 Filing 10 (FILED IN ERROR) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Brackin Wholesale Coatings, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Brackin Wholesale Coatings, Inc. for Brackin Wholesale Coatings, Inc..(Ignozzi, Marie) Modified on 5/2/2019 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
May 1, 2019 Filing 9 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Plum Dragon Herbs, Inc. (Conti, Anthony)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 4/30/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
April 30, 2019 Filing 7 QC NOTICE: #2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Brackin Wholesale Coatings, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **The Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement needs to be refiled and the corporate parent and/or affiliations need to be entered when the system prompts you. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
April 29, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (3-6) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR QUEEN ANNE'S COUNTY. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
April 29, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of filing of state court discovery material (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents to Defendant Brackin Wholesale Coatings, Inc., #2 Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Nova Molecular Technologies, Inc., #3 Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents to Defendant Nova Molecular Technologies, Inc.)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
April 29, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Brackin Wholesale Coatings, Inc. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Brackin Wholesale Coatings, Inc. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Brackin Wholesale Coatings, Inc., Nova Molecular Technologies, Inc. filed by Plum Dragon Herbs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Case Information Report)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
April 29, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Ellen L. Hollander. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 (FILED IN ERROR) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Brackin Wholesale Coatings, Inc. (Ignozzi, Marie) Modified on 4/30/2019 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Queen Anne's County, case number C-17-CV-19-000074. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7980924), filed by Brackin Wholesale Coatings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ignozzi, Marie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plum Dragon Herbs, Inc. v. Brackin Wholesale Coatings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nova Molecular Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Catherine A Hanrahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brackin Wholesale Coatings, Inc.
Represented By: Marie J Ignozzi
Represented By: Howard J Schulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plum Dragon Herbs, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony Michael Conti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?