Dorsey v. Watson
Plaintiff: Lilly Dorsey
Defendant: Charles Watson
Case Number: 1:2019cv01278
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: A David Copperthite
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 19 Rule 12/56 letter mailed to Lilly Dorsey (krs, Deputy Clerk)
June 24, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Charles Watson (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Request for Hearing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Green, Walter)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 11/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 6/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Initial Scheduling Order, #2 Standing Memorandum to Counsel Concerning Discovery) (c/m 6/19/19) (krs, Deputy Clerk)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 6/19/2019. (docket sheet c/m 6/19/19) (krs, Deputy Clerk)
June 13, 2019 Filing 14 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Charles Watson (Green, Walter)
June 13, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Charles Watson.(Green, Walter)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER striking #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim for failure to comply with ECF 6 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 6/12/2019. (Chambers) (c/m 6/12/19)
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 [FILED IN ERROR - Motion to Dismiss Stricken] Rule 12/56 letter mailed to Lilly Dorsey (krs, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 6/12/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. Charles Watson or counsel for Charles Watson are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 6/26/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 [STRICKEN PER 12 Paperless Order] MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Charles Watson (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Request for Hearing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Green, Walter) Modified on 6/12/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Charles Watson served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019.(krs, Deputy Clerk)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 5/21/2019. (c/m) (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. Lilly Dorsey or counsel for Lilly Dorsey are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 6/4/2019. (c/m)(hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Charles Watson. (Attachments: #1 USM 285 Form)(hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting Dorsey 21 days to complete and return the Marshal form to the Clerk and provide service copy of the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 5/1/2019. (c/m 5/2/19) (krs, Deputy Clerk)
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lilly Dorsey(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Charles Watson, filed by Lilly Dorsey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Attachment, #4 Attachment, #5 Exhibit Paperwork Submitted To Unemployment Hearing Officer, #6 Exhibit Conversation Between Plaintiff and Defendant, #7 Exhibit Text Messages Between Plaintiff and Mr. Michael Olina, #8 Exhibit Relatives Obituary, #9 Exhibit Separation Agreement, #10 Exhibit Paperwork Received From EEOC, #11 Exhibit Paystubs, etc.)(jb5, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dorsey v. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lilly Dorsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Watson
Represented By: Walter W Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?