Shore et al v. Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Shore, Ms Donna Curry and Donna Curry
Defendant: Officer Jemell Rayam, Momodu Bondeva Kenton Gondo, Major Ian Dombrowski, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City, Thomas Allers, Dep. Police Comm. Dean Palmere, Momodu Bondevea Kenton Gondo, John Does 6-10, Dean Palmere, The Baltimore Police Department, Ian Dombrowski, John Does 1-5 and Jemell Rayam
Case Number: 1:2019cv01341
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Referring Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING Show Cause Hearing re: #7 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 5/30/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing Plaintiffs Jeffrey Shore and Donna Curry to show cause for failure to comply with #Standing Order 2018-04. Show Cause Hearing set for 6/28/2019 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before the Chambers Judge. This Order shall be vacated if Plaintiffs Jeffrey Shore and Donna Curry files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 5/28/2019. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 5/10/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. Donna Curry, Jeffrey Shore or counsel for Donna Curry, Jeffrey Shore are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 5/24/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
May 10, 2019 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher. Judge Richard D. Bennett no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Thomas Allers, Ian Dombrowski, Momodu Bondevea Kenton Gondo, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City, Dean Palmere, Jemell Rayam, The Baltimore Police Department.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Donna Curry, Jeffrey Shore re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Bennett, Matthew)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by Donna Curry, Jeffrey Shore was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Summons. To correct this problem, file Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Summons to #1 Complaint. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7998739.), filed by Jeffrey Shore, Donna Curry. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bennett, Matthew) Modified on 5/8/2019 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shore et al v. Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Jemell Rayam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Momodu Bondeva Kenton Gondo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Ian Dombrowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Allers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dep. Police Comm. Dean Palmere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Momodu Bondevea Kenton Gondo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 6-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Palmere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Baltimore Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Dombrowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jemell Rayam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Shore
Represented By: Marc L Zayon
Represented By: Matthew Evan Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms Donna Curry
Represented By: Marc L Zayon
Represented By: Matthew Evan Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Curry
Represented By: Marc L Zayon
Represented By: Matthew Evan Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?