Balch v. Oracle Corporation
Plaintiff: David Balch
Defendant: Oracle Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv01353
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah K Chasanow
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by Oracle Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sullivan, Carson)
June 7, 2019 Filing 13 Supplemental to #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Oracle Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Motion for Special Admission, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Order on Joint Emergency Motion to Seal and Redact)(Sullivan, Carson)
May 29, 2019 Filing 12 Request for Hearing re #7 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award (Schwaber, Jeffrey)
May 29, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award and Reply in support of Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award filed by David Balch.(Schwaber, Jeffrey)
May 22, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE re #5 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Oracle Corporation.(Sullivan, Carson)
May 15, 2019 Filing 9 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by David Balch (Schwaber, Jeffrey)
May 15, 2019 Filing 8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Oracle Corporation (Brown, Barbara)
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award by Oracle Corporation (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Barbara)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Carson Hobbs Sullivan. Directing attorney Carson Hobbs Sullivan to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 5/10/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 5/9/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 Joint MOTION to Seal and Redact by Oracle Corporation (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Barbara)
May 8, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Deborah K. Chasanow. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 -SEALED - NOTICE of Filing Under Seal Exhibit B to Notice of Removal by Oracle Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Brown, Barbara)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Carson H. Sullivan (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8000711.) by Oracle Corporation(Brown, Barbara)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Howard County, case number C-13-CV-19-000343. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8000464), filed by Oracle Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award [Public], #2 Exhibit B - State Court Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award [Submitted Under Seal], #3 Exhibit C - State Court Scheduling Order, #4 Exhibit D - State Court Writ of Summons, #5 Exhibit E - State Court Joint Emergency Motion to Seal [Pending], #6 Exhibit F - State Court Notice of Hearing, #7 Exhibit G - State Court Order on Hearing, #8 Exhibit H - Civil Cover Sheet)(Brown, Barbara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Balch v. Oracle Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Balch
Represented By: Jeffrey M Schwaber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oracle Corporation
Represented By: Barbara Berish Brown
Represented By: Carson Hobbs Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?