Jordan et al v. Bogan
Plaintiff: Nakia Jordan and Doniya Downing
Defendant: Bryan Bogan
Case Number: 1:2019cv01407
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: A David Copperthite
Referring Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981cv
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable (ECF #5 ). Mail sent to Nikia Jordan (krs, Deputy Clerk)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER dismissing the Complaint without prejudice; closing this case. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 6/21/2019. (c/m 6/21/19)(krs, Deputy Clerk)
June 21, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Ellen L. Hollander. Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite no longer assigned to the case. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 and #4 Motions for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting plaintiff 21 days to complete the Marshal forms and return them to the Clerk and to provide service copies of the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 5/21/2019. (c/m and forms 5/21/19) (krs, Deputy Clerk)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Doniya Downing(ds3, Deputy Clerk)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Nakia Jordan(ds3, Deputy Clerk)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bryan Bogan, filed by Nakia Jordan, Doniya Downing. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(ds3, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan et al v. Bogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nakia Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doniya Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Bogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?