Clark et al v. Almy
Appellant: Paul C. Clark, Sr., Paul Clark, Jr. and Rebecca Delorme
Appellee: Monique S. Almy
Debtor: Council of Unit Owners of the 100 Harborview Drive
Case Number: 1:2019cv01437
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 12 Appellant's BRIEF by Paul C. Clark, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C, #4 Appendix D)(McCarthy, Brennan)
July 11, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION for Joinder in Support of Plan Officer's Motion to Dismiss Appeal, #4 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal filed by Paul C. Clark, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(McCarthy, Brennan)
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 [FILED IN ERROR] Appellee's BRIEF by Paul C. Clark, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C, #4 Appendix D)(McCarthy, Brennan) Modified on 7/11/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 [FILED IN ERROR - atty to refile] Appellant's BRIEF by Paul C. Clark, Sr.(McCarthy, Brennan) Modified on 7/11/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Joinder in Support of Plan Officer's Motion to Dismiss Appeal by Council of Unit Owners of the 100 Harborview Drive(Sweeney, Paul)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by James R Schraf on behalf of Council of Unit Owners of the 100 Harborview Drive (Schraf, James)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Yonka Stevens on behalf of Council of Unit Owners of the 100 Harborview Drive (Stevens, Lisa)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Sweeney on behalf of Council of Unit Owners of the 100 Harborview Drive (Sweeney, Paul)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal by Monique S. Almy (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Almy, Monique)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL OF RECORD ON APPEAL (Attachments: #1 #1012 Order granting Plan Offier's Motion for Clarification Regarding Reorganized Debtor's Collection of Assessments, #2 #1014 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election, #3 #1014-1 Order granting Plan Offier's Motion for Clarification Regarding Reorganized Debtor's Collection of Assessments)(dass, Deputy Clerk)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy notification letter mailed to parties (krs, Deputy Clerk)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. (Baltimore). Bankruptcy Court case number 16-13049, filed by Paul C. Clark, Sr, Rebecca Delorme, Paul Clark, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Order Being Appealed, #2 BK Docket Sheet, #3 Transmittal Sheet)(krs, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark et al v. Almy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Paul C. Clark, Sr.
Represented By: Brennan C McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Paul Clark, Jr.
Represented By: Brennan C McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Rebecca Delorme
Represented By: Brennan C McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Monique S. Almy
Represented By: Monique Desiree Almy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Council of Unit Owners of the 100 Harborview Drive
Represented By: James R Schraf
Represented By: Lisa Yonka Stevens
Represented By: Paul Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?