Jackson v. R&R Taqueria

Plaintiff: Dominique Jackson
Defendant: R&R Taqueria
Case Number: 1:2019cv01482
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: A David Copperthite
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER directing Dominique Jackson to show cause for failure to comply with #Standing Order 2018-04. Show Cause Hearing set for 8/30/2019 02:00 PM before the Chambers Judge. This Order shall be vacated if Dominique Jackson files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 7/18/2019. (c/m 7/18/19 bas, Deputy Clerk)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting Plaintiff 14 days to complete the Marshal forms and return it to the Clerk.. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 7/8/2019. (c/m w/USM Service Form 7/8/19 bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Dominique Jackson as to R&R Taqueria.(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 7/2/2019. (c/m w/forms 7/2/19 bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. Dominique Jackson or counsel for Dominique Jackson are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 7/16/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued 21 days as to R&R Taqueria.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; and granting Plaintiff 21 days to complete the Marshal forms and return it to the Clerk. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 6/10/2019. (c/m 6/10/19 bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Right to Sue Letter by Dominique Jackson (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing Jackson to file a Notice of Right to Sue letter from the Equal Employment Opportunity Commission within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 5/22/2019. (c/m 5/22/19 bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dominique Jackson(ko, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against R&R Taqueria, filed by Dominique Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(ko, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. R&R Taqueria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominique Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R&R Taqueria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?