Song v. Azar et al

Plaintiff: Shaoming Song
Defendant: Alex Azar, Michael Evans, Michael Bernier and National Institute on Aging/National Institute of Health
Case Number: 1:2019cv01501
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Shaoming Song (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 Supplement to #1 Complaint filed by Shaoming Song. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing Song to properly serve Defendants; granting #4 Song's Motion to Supplement; directing the Clerk to docket the Supplement; and denying #5 Song's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 6/25/2019. (c/m 6/25/19 bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE as to Robert K. Hur by Shaoming Song (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service on William Barr, #2 Proof of Service on Alex M. Azar, III, #3 Certificate of Service)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shaoming Song (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Acknowledge a Mistake in Relief and to Amend It by Shaoming Song (Attachments: #1 Proposed Revised Relief, #2 Certificate of Service)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued 60 days as to Alex Azar, Michael Bernier, Michael Evans, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (c/m 5/23/19 bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare and return the summons to Song. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 5/23/2019. (c/m 5/23/19 bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alex Azar, Michael Bernier, Michael Evans, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637115232.), filed by Shaoming Song. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment, #3 Exhibit, #4 Relief, #5 Summons, #6 Envelope)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Song v. Azar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Bernier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Institute on Aging/National Institute of Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaoming Song
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?