Foster v. Frontpoint Security Solutions LLC et al

Plaintiff: Andrew Foster
Defendant: Hillcrest, Davidson, and Associates LLC, Frontpoint Security Solutions LLC and Hillcrest, Davidson & Associates LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01528
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: J Mark Coulson
Referring Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge George Levi Russell, III. Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING Show Cause Hearing re: #5 Order to Show Cause. Signed by the Chambers Judge on 6/10/2019. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing Andrew Foster to show cause for failure to comply with #Standing Order 2018-04. Show Cause Hearing set for 7/26/2019 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson. This Order shall be vacated if Andrew Foster files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 6/7/2019. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 5/23/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson. Andrew Foster or counsel for Andrew Foster are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 6/6/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Frontpoint Security Solutions LLC, Hillcrest, Davidson, and Associates LLC. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8028569.), filed by Andrew Foster. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Finner, Wendell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foster v. Frontpoint Security Solutions LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillcrest, Davidson, and Associates LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frontpoint Security Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillcrest, Davidson & Associates LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Foster
Represented By: Wendell David Finner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?