Dudley et al v CMH Homes, Inc.
Plaintiff: Victor Nunez, Sabrina Dudley, Jennifer Koehler, Mario Trevino, Laurie Hofele and James Motter
Defendant: CMH Homes, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01546
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: James K Bredar
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint by Sabrina Dudley, Laurie Hofele, Jennifer Koehler, James Motter, Victor Nunez, Mario Trevino (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Davis, Benjamin)
July 9, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM to Counsel re the Fair Labor Standards Act. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 7/9/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
July 5, 2019 Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Janella Ahnert. Directing attorney Janella Ahnert to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 7/5/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 Corrected CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Janell Ahnert by CMH Homes, Inc.. The fee has already been paid.(Allen, William)
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 QC NOTICE: #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by CMH Homes, Inc. needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 Consent MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Janell Ahnert (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8095004.) by CMH Homes, Inc.(Allen, William)
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Laurie Hofele of Consent to be a Party Plaintiff (Davis, Benjamin)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua B Waxman on behalf of CMH Homes, Inc. (Waxman, Joshua)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer CMH Homes, Inc. answer due 7/24/2019. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 6/21/2019. (bpgs, Chambers)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Mita on behalf of CMH Homes, Inc. (Mita, Brandon)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer #1 Complaint by CMH Homes, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Allen, William) Modified on 6/20/2019 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by James Motter of Consent to be a Party Plaintiff (Davis, Benjamin)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sabrina Dudley, Jennifer Koehler, Mario Trevino, Victor Nunez. CMH Homes, Inc. served on 6/3/2019, answer due 6/24/2019.(Davis, Benjamin)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to CMH Homes, Inc. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Wages Owed against CMH Homes, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8032756.), filed by Sabrina Dudley, Jennifer Koehler, Mario Trevino, Victor Nunez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Summons)(Davis, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dudley et al v CMH Homes, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Nunez
Represented By: Benjamin L Davis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina Dudley
Represented By: Benjamin L Davis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Koehler
Represented By: Benjamin L Davis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Trevino
Represented By: Benjamin L Davis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Hofele
Represented By: Benjamin L Davis, III
Represented By: Michael Arthur Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Motter
Represented By: Benjamin L Davis, III
Represented By: Michael Arthur Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMH Homes, Inc.
Represented By: Janella Ahnert
Represented By: Joshua B Waxman
Represented By: William F Allen
Represented By: Brandon Mita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?